This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2019 at 07:48:06 (UTC).

Lanthier v. Katz et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 Lanthier filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Katz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02074

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Renee H. Lanthier

Defendants

Cleary Benefits Group, Inc.

Heather Katz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Douglas Mark Evans

Attorney at Kroll McNamara Evans & Delahanty

65 Memorial Rd., Suite 300

West Hartford, CT 06107

Paul L. Leclair

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 East Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Robert Yawman, III

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 East Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Defendant Attorney

Kirby G. Huget

Attorney at Law Offices of David J. Mathis

One Hartford Plaza

Hartford, CT 06155

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Replacement PDF

#16

#15

#14

9 #1

Affidavit

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Renee H. Lanthier. (Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Cleary Benefits Group, Inc., Heather Katz.(Huget, Kirby) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Summons Returned Executed Acknowledgment filed by Renee H. Lanthier. (Evans, Douglas) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Yawman, III on behalf of Renee H. Lanthier (Yawman, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2019: #1 Replacement PDF) (Reis, Julia). (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Leclair on behalf of Renee H. Lanthier (Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul L. Leclair, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5117811), #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert P. Yawman, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5117721) by Renee H. Lanthier. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE by Renee H. Lanthier of Filing of Certificates of Good Standing (Evans, Douglas) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul L. Leclair. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2019. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert P. Yawman. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2019. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul L. Leclair, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5117811) by Renee H. Lanthier. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Evans, Douglas) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kirby G. Huget on behalf of Cleary Benefits Group, Inc., Heather Katz (Huget, Kirby) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee H. Lanthier. Cleary Benefits Group, Inc. served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019; Heather Katz served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Evans, Douglas) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cleary Benefits Group, Inc., Heather Katz* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Douglas Mark Evans* *Kroll McNamara Evans & Delahanty* *65 Memorial Rd., Suite 300* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Renee H. Lanthier, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2019. Discovery due by 6/19/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Evans, Douglas) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5090562.), filed by Renee H. Lanthier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Douglas) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul L. Leclair

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Mark Evans