This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:06:25 (UTC).

LANGSTON v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 LANGSTON filed an Other lawsuit against TRANS UNION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03645

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINA LANGSTON

Defendants

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC

MONTEREY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

TRANS UNION, LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENT F. VULLINGS

Attorney at VULLINGS LAW GROUP LLC

3953 Ridge Pike, Ste102

Collegeville, PA 19426

Defendant Attorneys

JONATHAN D. KLEIN

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

2005 Market St Suite 1000, One Commerce Square, Suite 1000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

BRENDAN H. LITTLE

Attorney at LIPPES MATHIAS WEXLER FRIEDMAN LLP

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1700

Buffalo, NY 14202

ERIK J. JONES

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES PC

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

CASEY GREEN

Attorney at SIDKOFF, PINCUS & GREEN, P.C.

1101 Market Street, 2700 Aramark Tower

Philadelphia, PA 19107

CONOR REARDON

Attorney at JONES DAY

250 Vesey St

New York, NY 10281

MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN

Attorney at MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN

The Curtis Center, Suite 400E, 170 S. Independence Mall, W.

Philadelphia, PA 19106-3337

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., MONTEREY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13007567.), filed by MARTINA LANGSTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTINA LANGSTON re: Christopher Todd Horton served Summons and Complaint upon EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by personal service. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTINA LANGSTON re: Richard Krolikowski served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTINA LANGSTON re: D'Wayne Henriksson served Summons and Complaint upon TRANS UNION, LLC by personal service. TRANS UNION, LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erik J. Jones, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13032847.). (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#23

(#23) ANSWER to Complaint by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(REARDON, CONOR) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#22

(#22) Proposed Case Management Plan Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by MARTINA LANGSTON. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#21

(#21) Proposed Case Management Plan Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (KLEIN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#20

(#20) REVISED ORDER THAT THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/23/2018 AT 10:30 A.M., HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO TAKE PLACE ON 10/23/2018 AT 11:00 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/3/18. 10/4/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#19

(#19) REVISED ORDER THAT THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE ORIGINALLY SCHEDULED FOR 10/9/2018 AT 2:00 P.M., HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO TAKE PLACE ON 10/23/2018 AT 10:30 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/2/18. 10/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#18

(#18) Letter to Judge Rufe dated 10/1/18 to Continue Rule 16 Conference filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.(REARDON, CONOR) Modified on 10/5/2018 (tjd). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#17

(#17) ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON 10/9/2018 AT 2:00 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/26/18. 9/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#16

(#16) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Monterey Financial Holdings, LLC with Certificate of Service by MONTEREY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC.(LITTLE, BRENDAN) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by MONTEREY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(LITTLE, BRENDAN) Modified on 9/26/2018 (tjd). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ANSWER to Complaint by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(REARDON, CONOR) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Proposed Case Management Plan Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by MARTINA LANGSTON. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Proposed Case Management Plan Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (KLEIN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REVISED ORDER THAT THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/23/2018 AT 10:30 A.M., HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO TAKE PLACE ON 10/23/2018 AT 11:00 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/3/18. 10/4/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REVISED ORDER THAT THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE ORIGINALLY SCHEDULED FOR 10/9/2018 AT 2:00 P.M., HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO TAKE PLACE ON 10/23/2018 AT 10:30 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/2/18. 10/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Letter to Judge Rufe dated 10/1/18 to Continue Rule 16 Conference filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.(REARDON, CONOR) Modified on 10/5/2018 (tjd). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON 10/9/2018 AT 2:00 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/26/18. 9/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Monterey Financial Holdings, LLC with Certificate of Service by MONTEREY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC.(LITTLE, BRENDAN) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to Complaint by MONTEREY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(LITTLE, BRENDAN) Modified on 9/26/2018 (tjd). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. with Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Conor Reardon, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13047266.) filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..certificate of counsel, certificate of service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF ERIK J. JONES, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/10/18. 9/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erik J. Jones, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13032847.). (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTINA LANGSTON re: D'Wayne Henriksson served Summons and Complaint upon TRANS UNION, LLC by personal service. TRANS UNION, LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTINA LANGSTON re: Richard Krolikowski served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTINA LANGSTON re: Christopher Todd Horton served Summons and Complaint upon EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by personal service. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARTINA LANGSTON. (jwl, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Summons Issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., MONTEREY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC. Four Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/27/18 (jwl, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., MONTEREY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13007567.), filed by MARTINA LANGSTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.