This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2019 at 07:26:15 (UTC).

Langerman v. Hollingsworth & Vose Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 Langerman filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Hollingsworth Vose Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J. Davis and Leo I. Brisbois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-03327

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Davis

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donna J Langerman

Donna J. Langerman

Defendants

R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company

Hollingsworth & Vose Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Thomas Gott

Attorney at Sieben Polk, P.A.

1640 South Frontage Road, Suite 200

Hastings, MN 55033

Erin M. Wood

Attorney at Waters & Kraus, LLP

3141 Hood Street, Ste 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Michael R Strom

Attorney at Sieben Polk Law Firm

1640 South Frontage Road, Suite 200

Hastings, MN 55033

Gibbs C Henderson

Attorney at Gibbs C. Henderson

3141 Hood Street, Ste 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew R Thibodeau

Attorney at Thibodeau, Johnson & Feriancek PLLP

800 Lonsdale Building, 302 West Superior St

Duluth, MN 55802

Suzanne M Teeven

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

2345 Grand Blvd, Ste 2000

Kansas City, MO 64113

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Consent Form

#29

(#29) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(VLM) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

28 #1

Civil Notice - appeal

#28

(#28) JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(JLB) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#27

(#27) AMENDED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL #26 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and without costs to either party as to Defendant Hollingsworth & Vose Company. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/18/2019. (GRR) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#26

(#26) ORDER FOR DISMISSAL #25 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and without costs to either party. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/17/2019. (GRR) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#25

(#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#24

(#24) ORDER REFERRING #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company to Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/11/2019. (GRR) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#16

(#20) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #16 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company.(Thibodeau, Matthew) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#9

(#9) Return of Service Executed for Complaint served on Hollingsworth & Vose Company on 12/13/2018, filed by Donna J. Langerman. (Gott, Ryan) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gibbs C. Henderson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6568567 filed by Donna J. Langerman. (Gott, Ryan) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin M. Wood. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6568564 filed by Donna J. Langerman. (Gott, Ryan) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna J. Langerman. R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Gott, Ryan) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Hollingsworth & Vose Company, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (AKL) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint,. (Gott, Ryan) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (JLB). (Entered: 12/06/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

#1

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint,. (Gott, Ryan) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (JLB). (Entered: 12/06/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(VLM) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(JLB) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) AMENDED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL #26 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and without costs to either party as to Defendant Hollingsworth & Vose Company. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/18/2019. (GRR) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER FOR DISMISSAL #25 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and without costs to either party. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/17/2019. (GRR) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER REFERRING #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company to Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/11/2019. (GRR) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction from Matthew R. Thibodeau. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Hollingsworth & Vose Company. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company.(Thibodeau, Matthew) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #16 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company.(Thibodeau, Matthew) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Thibodeau on behalf of All Defendants. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return of Service Executed for Complaint served on Hollingsworth & Vose Company on 12/13/2018, filed by Donna J. Langerman. (Gott, Ryan) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gibbs C. Henderson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6568567 filed by Donna J. Langerman. (Gott, Ryan) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin M. Wood. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6568564 filed by Donna J. Langerman. (Gott, Ryan) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna J. Langerman. R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Gott, Ryan) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • (#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Peter Kraus; Gibbs C. Henderson; Erin M. Wood as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Hollingsworth & Vose Company, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (AKL) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • (#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18cv3327 MJD/LIB. (AKL) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint,. (Gott, Ryan) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (JLB). (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6532244) filed by Donna J Langerman. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gott, Ryan) Modified on 12/6/2018 (AKL). (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.