This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2018 at 08:13:28 (UTC).

Lane v. United States Bureau of Prisons et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 Lane filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against United States Bureau of Prisons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are D. P. Marshall Jr. and J. Thomas Ray. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00153

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

Referral Judge

J. Thomas Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr

Forrest City, AR 72336-9000

Defendants

Brooke Boyles

Hendricks

United States Bureau of Prisons

T Carter

Odom

Watkins

Gene Beasley

Godlove

Marrs

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#11

(#11) JUDGMENT: Lane's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2018. (jak) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER: The Court withdraws the reference. #9 Motion to dismiss granted. Lane's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. #1 , #5 , & #6 Motions denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2018. (jak) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (ljb) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing Inmate Account Statement re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (llg) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (ljb) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a trust fund account calculation sheet and certificate; and directing Plaintiff to (1) have that form completed by an authorized prison official; and (2) return it to the Clerk on or before 12/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/8/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to #2 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

2 #1

Main Document - Correct

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr.(llg) Additional attachment added on 11/2/2018: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (llg) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) JUDGMENT: Lane's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2018. (jak) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: The Court withdraws the reference. #9 Motion to dismiss granted. Lane's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. #1 , #5 , & #6 Motions denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2018. (jak) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (ljb) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Filing Inmate Account Statement re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (llg) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (ljb) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a trust fund account calculation sheet and certificate; and directing Plaintiff to (1) have that form completed by an authorized prison official; and (2) return it to the Clerk on or before 12/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/8/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to #2 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr.(llg) Additional attachment added on 11/2/2018: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Wayne Lane, Jr. (llg) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less