This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2019 at 07:43:17 (UTC).

Lane v. Kelly et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Lane filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kelly. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Thomas Ray and Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00305

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

J. Thomas Ray

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Lane

Grady, AR 71644-0500

Defendants

Bass

Marshall Reed

Patrick Pierre

Wendy Kelly

Musselwhite

William Stroughn

Tasha Griffen

Chris Budnick

Rory Griffen

Kenneth Starks

Kathy White

Isaac Wade

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brittany Nicole Edwards

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER approving and adopting #8 Recommended Partial Disposition in all respects; denying #4 Lane's motion to the extent it requests an ex parte temporary restraining order and holding in abeyance his request for preliminary injunctive relief pending a response from Defendants; granting #11 Motion for Copies and directing the Clerk of Court to send him a copy of #9 declaration; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal of this ruling would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/9/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER allowing Lane to proceed with his failure to protect, retaliation and corrective inaction claims against Defendants Pierre, Wade, Stroughn, Budnick, Musselwhite, Kelly, Rory Griffen, Starks, Tasha Griffen, Bass and Reed; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Pierre, Wade, Stroughn, Budnick, Musselwhite, Kelly, Rory Griffen, Starks, Tasha Griffen, Bass and Reed; directing the USMS to serve the summons, #2 Lane's Complaint, #3 Memorandum of Law, #4 Motion for Order, #5 Declaration and this Order, on them through the ADC Compliance Division without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor; allowing Lane to proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against Defendant White; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for White; directing the USMS to serve the Summons, #2 Lane's Complaint, #3 Memorandum of Law, #4 Motion for Order, #5 Declaration, and this Order, on White through Humphries, Odum & Eubanks law firm without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor; and directing all Defendants to respond to Lane's requests for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/20/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION by Adam Lane. (ljb) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#8

(#8) RECOMMENDED PARTIAL DISPOSITION recommending that #4 Lane's Motion for Order be denied to the extent he seeks an ex parte temporary restraining order; and Lane's request for preliminary injunctive relief be held in abeyance pending a response from Defendants. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/20/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Order by Adam Lane. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Order filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Declaration of Warden William Straughn)(Edwards, Brittany) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (tjb) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Lane. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Clarify and MOTION for copies by Adam Lane. (llg) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bass, Chris Budnick, Rory Griffen, Tasha Griffen, Wendy Kelly, Musselwhite, Patrick Pierre, Marshall Reed, Kenneth Starks, William Stroughn, Isaac Wade, Kathy White.(Edwards, Brittany) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Adam Lane.(llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam Lane. (kdr) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#5

(#5) DECLARATION by Adam Lane. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A, Declaration of Warden William Straughn

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Nicole Edwards on behalf of Bass, Chris Budnick, Rory Griffen, Tasha Griffen, Wendy Kelly, Musselwhite, Patrick Pierre, Marshall Reed, Kenneth Starks, William Stroughn, Isaac Wade, Kathy White (Edwards, Brittany) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT of #2 Complaint filed by Adam Lane. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#6

(#6) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Cummins Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/18/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (tjb) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Order filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Declaration of Warden William Straughn)(Edwards, Brittany) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bass, Chris Budnick, Rory Griffen, Tasha Griffen, Wendy Kelly, Musselwhite, Patrick Pierre, Marshall Reed, Kenneth Starks, William Stroughn, Isaac Wade, Kathy White.(Edwards, Brittany) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Nicole Edwards on behalf of Bass, Chris Budnick, Rory Griffen, Tasha Griffen, Wendy Kelly, Musselwhite, Patrick Pierre, Marshall Reed, Kenneth Starks, William Stroughn, Isaac Wade, Kathy White (Edwards, Brittany) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER approving and adopting #8 Recommended Partial Disposition in all respects; denying #4 Lane's motion to the extent it requests an ex parte temporary restraining order and holding in abeyance his request for preliminary injunctive relief pending a response from Defendants; granting #11 Motion for Copies and directing the Clerk of Court to send him a copy of #9 declaration; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal of this ruling would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/9/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Clarify and MOTION for copies by Adam Lane. (llg) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam Lane. (kdr) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION by Adam Lane. (ljb) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RECOMMENDED PARTIAL DISPOSITION recommending that #4 Lane's Motion for Order be denied to the extent he seeks an ex parte temporary restraining order; and Lane's request for preliminary injunctive relief be held in abeyance pending a response from Defendants. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/20/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER allowing Lane to proceed with his failure to protect, retaliation and corrective inaction claims against Defendants Pierre, Wade, Stroughn, Budnick, Musselwhite, Kelly, Rory Griffen, Starks, Tasha Griffen, Bass and Reed; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Pierre, Wade, Stroughn, Budnick, Musselwhite, Kelly, Rory Griffen, Starks, Tasha Griffen, Bass and Reed; directing the USMS to serve the summons, #2 Lane's Complaint, #3 Memorandum of Law, #4 Motion for Order, #5 Declaration and this Order, on them through the ADC Compliance Division without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor; allowing Lane to proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against Defendant White; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for White; directing the USMS to serve the Summons, #2 Lane's Complaint, #3 Memorandum of Law, #4 Motion for Order, #5 Declaration, and this Order, on White through Humphries, Odum & Eubanks law firm without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor; and directing all Defendants to respond to Lane's requests for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/20/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Cummins Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/18/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION by Adam Lane. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Order by Adam Lane. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT of #2 Complaint filed by Adam Lane. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Adam Lane.(llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Lane. (llg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.