This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 08:00:44 (UTC).

LANDAVERDE v. CLELLAND

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 LANDAVERDE filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against CLELLAND. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CATHERINE C. EAGLES and JOE L. WEBSTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00839

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CATHERINE C. EAGLES

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALFONSO MAURICIO LANDAVERDE

Badin, NC 28009

Respondent

JACK CLELLAND

 

Court Documents

2 #2

Cover Letter

2 #1

Envelope - Front and Back

#4

(#4) Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 11/28/2018. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 12/3/2018. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#1

(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by ALFONSO MAURICIO LANDAVERDE. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (pursuant to 28: U.S.C. 2241), filed by ALFONSO MAURICIO LANDAVERDE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #2 Cover Letter) (Butler, Carol). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION as to ALFONSO MAURICIO LANDAVERDE, signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 11/14/2018. ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Petitioner 2254 forms, instructions, and a current application to proceed in forma pauperis. RECOMMENDED that this action be filed, but then dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Petitioner filing a new petition which corrects the defects of the current Petition. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #3 Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge, by Petitioner ALFONSO MAURICIO LANDAVERDE. Response to Objections to R&R due by 12/14/2018 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #3 Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge, by Petitioner ALFONSO MAURICIO LANDAVERDE. Response to Objections to R&R due by 12/14/2018 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 11/28/2018. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 12/3/2018. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #1 Motion for Application to Proceed IFP. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 11/14/2018. See #3 .(Butler, Carol) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION as to ALFONSO MAURICIO LANDAVERDE, signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 11/14/2018. ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Petitioner 2254 forms, instructions, and a current application to proceed in forma pauperis. RECOMMENDED that this action be filed, but then dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Petitioner filing a new petition which corrects the defects of the current Petition. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • CASE REFERRED for Screening (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (pursuant to 28: U.S.C. 2241), filed by ALFONSO MAURICIO LANDAVERDE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #2 Cover Letter) (Butler, Carol). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by ALFONSO MAURICIO LANDAVERDE. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.