This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 17:01:47 (UTC).

Lancaster et al v. Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 Lancaster filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00244

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnny Labron Lancaster

Lawanda Lancaster

Defendants

Medtronic, Inc.

Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc.

Medtronic USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marvin B Berke

Attorney at Berke, Berke & Berke

P O Box 4747, 420 Frazier Avenue

Chattanooga, TN 37405-4747

Erin V Wallin

Attorney at Berke, Berke & Berke

P O Box 4747, 420 Frazier Avenue

Chattanooga, TN 37405-4747

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary B. Busey

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman Caldwell and Berkowitz, PC(Memphis)

165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000 First Tennessee Building

Memphis, TN 38103

Gary C Shockley

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (Nashville)

211 Commerce Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37201-1800

Kayla A Brewe

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP (MO)

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Bryan T. Pratt

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP (MO)

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

 

Court Documents

#15

(#25) MOTION for Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines re #15 Scheduling Order, (Unopposed) by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

27 #1

Other Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3792053), filed by Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Busey, Zachary) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#26

(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines re #15 Scheduling Order. Any deadlines or dates not listed below will remain in place, while the following deadlines are hereby RESET (as set forth in the order herein).Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/2019. (BJL) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#25

(#25) MOTION for Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines re #15 Scheduling Order, (Unopposed) by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/12/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#3

(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/12/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#24

(#24) Agreed ORDER For Medical Records granting #23 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 7/22/2019. (BJL) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/12/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medtronic USA, Inc.. (Busey, Zachary) Modified on 10/15/2018 (BJL, ). Added Corporate Parent - Medtronic PLC to Medtronic USA, Inc. Role - dft (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#5

Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin Wallin, filed by Lawanda Lancaster, Johnny Labron Lancaster (BJL, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#27

(#27) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order)(Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Records by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other - Proposed Agreed Order for Medical Records)(Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#22

(#22) Administrative Notice to Counsel #21 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Records :Orders not agreed to by all parties should NOT be included as an attachment to a motion or other request for relief. Please refer to ECF rules to make necessary corrections. (BDG) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#23

(#23) Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Records (proposed order submitted) by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medtronic, Inc.. (Busey, Zachary) Modified on 10/15/2018 (BJL, ). Added Corporate Parent - Medtronic PLC to Medtronic, Inc. Role - dft (Entered: 10/12/2018)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order)(Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines re #15 Scheduling Order. Any deadlines or dates not listed below will remain in place, while the following deadlines are hereby RESET (as set forth in the order herein).Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/2019. (BJL) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION for Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines re #15 Scheduling Order, (Unopposed) by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Agreed ORDER For Medical Records granting #23 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 7/22/2019. (BJL) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Records (proposed order submitted) by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Administrative Notice to Counsel #21 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Records :Orders not agreed to by all parties should NOT be included as an attachment to a motion or other request for relief. Please refer to ECF rules to make necessary corrections. (BDG) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Records by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other - Proposed Agreed Order for Medical Records)(Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kayla A. Brewe on behalf of Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 05/01/2019. (KRS) Modified on 5/2/2019 (BJL).* Mailed to Attorney Kayla A. Brewe. (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan T. Pratt on behalf of Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 05/01/2019. (KRS) Modified on 5/2/2019 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Bryan T. Pratt. (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Bryan T. Pratt) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3955900.) filed by Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kayla A. Brewe) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3955903.) filed by Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc. (BJL, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin Wallin, filed by Lawanda Lancaster, Johnny Labron Lancaster (BJL, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medtronic, Inc.. (Busey, Zachary) Modified on 10/15/2018 (BJL, ). Added Corporate Parent - Medtronic PLC to Medtronic, Inc. Role - dft (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medtronic USA, Inc.. (Busey, Zachary) Modified on 10/15/2018 (BJL, ). Added Corporate Parent - Medtronic PLC to Medtronic USA, Inc. Role - dft (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin Wallin, by Johnny Labron Lancaster, Lawanda Lancaster. (Berke, Marvin) Modified on 10/15/2018 (BJL, ). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/12/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/12/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/12/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3792053), filed by Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Busey, Zachary) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.