This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2019 at 08:08:45 (UTC).

Lampkin v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 Lampkin filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05727

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leila Lampkin

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Louis Boohaker

Attorney at McDonald Law Firm, P.C.

Suite 230, 3100 W. 7Th Street

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Thomas Dietrichs

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

Smita Gautam

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leila Lampkin by Leila Lampkin.(Boohaker, David) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement within seven (7) days from the date of entry of this order. If Plaintiff fails to file the CIP within the above-referenced deadline, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/6/2019. (cmd) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#9

(#9) Initial Disclosures by Leila Lampkin.(Boohaker, David) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Pursuant to the parties' request, the Court assigns this case to a six-month discovery period from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/24/2019. (cmd) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the parties to submit a JPRDP within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order and DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this action if the parties fail to file the JPRDP within the time specified herein. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/24/2019. (cmd) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#6

(#6) Initial Disclosures by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Gautam, Smita) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#5

(#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Gautam, Smita) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Bank, FSB, Other Affiliate State Farm Florida Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Oglesby Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Top Layer Reinsurance, Ltd., Other Affiliate State Farm Companies Foundation, Other Affiliate Insurance Placement Services, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm International Services, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm Finance Corporation of Canada, Other Affiliate SF Insurance Placement Corporation of Canada, Other Affiliate Idaho Pacific, LLC, Other Affiliate MICP, LLC, Other Affiliate SFCL, LLC, Other Affiliate SASAP, LLC, Other Affiliate MountainBrook, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoover Ross Bridge, LLC, Other Affiliate SF Risk Management Group, LLC, Other Affiliate SRL Portfolio, LLC, Other Affiliate 4eightyfive, LLC, Other Affiliate RS Realty, LLC, Other Affiliate New Jersey Kimball, LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office Investments One, LP, Other Affiliate BCS West Land Investments, LP, Other Affiliate St. Louis Market, LLC, Other Affiliate Town Square Retail, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlanta Office Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Tempe Office Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlanta Office Ph I, LLC, Other Affiliate EMVLP, LLC, Other Affiliate Austin Jack, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack II, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Mac Jack, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack IV, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack V, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Park III, LLC, Other Affiliate Idaho - Brockton, LP, Other Affiliate City Lights on Fig, LP, Other Affiliate SFSV Hill Airport Commerce, LP, Other Affiliate Durham Office Headquarters Buildings, LLC, Other Affiliate DRT, LP, Other Affiliate State Farm International Holding Company, Other Affiliate Foreign Securities Trust No. 1, Other Affiliate State Farm EM Equity Trust, Other Affiliate State Farm Lloyds, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm Liquidity Pool LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office Investments Two, LP, Other Affiliate State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, Other Affiliate State Farm Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Life and Accident Assurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Investment Management Corp., Other Affiliate State Farm Equity and Bond Fund (Symbol: SLBAX), Other Affiliate State Farm International Equity Fund (Symbol: SFFAX), Other Affiliate State Farm International Index Fund (Symbol: SIIAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small Cap Index Fund (Symbol: SMIAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small/Mid Cap Equity Fund (Symbol: SFSAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small/Mid Cap Equity Fund (Symbol: SFSAX), Other Affiliate State Farm General Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Gautam, Smita) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Affivavit - Kevin Diestel

1 #7

Federal Certificate

1 #6

State Court - Filing of Removal

1 #5

State Court- Answer - State Farm

1 #4

State Court- CSC Notice of Service

1 #3

State Court- Summons

1 #2

State Court -Complaint

1 #1

State Court -Case Filing Info Form

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Leila Lampkin by Leila Lampkin. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leila Lampkin by Leila Lampkin.(Boohaker, David) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement within seven (7) days from the date of entry of this order. If Plaintiff fails to file the CIP within the above-referenced deadline, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/6/2019. (cmd) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Initial Disclosures by Leila Lampkin.(Boohaker, David) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Pursuant to the parties' request, the Court assigns this case to a six-month discovery period from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/24/2019. (cmd) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the parties to submit a JPRDP within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order and DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this action if the parties fail to file the JPRDP within the time specified herein. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/24/2019. (cmd) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Disclosures by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Gautam, Smita) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Gautam, Smita) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Bank, FSB, Other Affiliate State Farm Florida Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Oglesby Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Top Layer Reinsurance, Ltd., Other Affiliate State Farm Companies Foundation, Other Affiliate Insurance Placement Services, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm International Services, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm Finance Corporation of Canada, Other Affiliate SF Insurance Placement Corporation of Canada, Other Affiliate Idaho Pacific, LLC, Other Affiliate MICP, LLC, Other Affiliate SFCL, LLC, Other Affiliate SASAP, LLC, Other Affiliate MountainBrook, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoover Ross Bridge, LLC, Other Affiliate SF Risk Management Group, LLC, Other Affiliate SRL Portfolio, LLC, Other Affiliate 4eightyfive, LLC, Other Affiliate RS Realty, LLC, Other Affiliate New Jersey Kimball, LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office Investments One, LP, Other Affiliate BCS West Land Investments, LP, Other Affiliate St. Louis Market, LLC, Other Affiliate Town Square Retail, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlanta Office Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Tempe Office Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlanta Office Ph I, LLC, Other Affiliate EMVLP, LLC, Other Affiliate Austin Jack, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack II, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Mac Jack, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack IV, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack V, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Park III, LLC, Other Affiliate Idaho - Brockton, LP, Other Affiliate City Lights on Fig, LP, Other Affiliate SFSV Hill Airport Commerce, LP, Other Affiliate Durham Office Headquarters Buildings, LLC, Other Affiliate DRT, LP, Other Affiliate State Farm International Holding Company, Other Affiliate Foreign Securities Trust No. 1, Other Affiliate State Farm EM Equity Trust, Other Affiliate State Farm Lloyds, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm Liquidity Pool LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office Investments Two, LP, Other Affiliate State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, Other Affiliate State Farm Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Life and Accident Assurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Investment Management Corp., Other Affiliate State Farm Equity and Bond Fund (Symbol: SLBAX), Other Affiliate State Farm International Equity Fund (Symbol: SFFAX), Other Affiliate State Farm International Index Fund (Symbol: SIIAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small Cap Index Fund (Symbol: SMIAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small/Mid Cap Equity Fund (Symbol: SFSAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small/Mid Cap Equity Fund (Symbol: SFSAX), Other Affiliate State Farm General Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Bank, FSB, Other Affiliate State Farm Florida Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Oglesby Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Top Layer Reinsurance, Ltd., Other Affiliate State Farm Companies Foundation, Other Affiliate Insurance Placement Services, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm International Services, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm Finance Corporation of Canada, Other Affiliate SF Insurance Placement Corporation of Canada, Other Affiliate Idaho Pacific, LLC, Other Affiliate MICP, LLC, Other Affiliate SFCL, LLC, Other Affiliate SASAP, LLC, Other Affiliate MountainBrook, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoover Ross Bridge, LLC, Other Affiliate SF Risk Management Group, LLC, Other Affiliate SRL Portfolio, LLC, Other Affiliate 4eightyfive, LLC, Other Affiliate RS Realty, LLC, Other Affiliate New Jersey Kimball, LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office Investments One, LP, Other Affiliate BCS West Land Investments, LP, Other Affiliate St. Louis Market, LLC, Other Affiliate Town Square Retail, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlanta Office Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Tempe Office Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlanta Office Ph I, LLC, Other Affiliate EMVLP, LLC, Other Affiliate Austin Jack, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack II, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Mac Jack, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack IV, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack V, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Park III, LLC, Other Affiliate Idaho - Brockton, LP, Other Affiliate City Lights on Fig, LP, Other Affiliate SFSV Hill Airport Commerce, LP, Other Affiliate Durham Office Headquarters Buildings, LLC, Other Affiliate DRT, LP, Other Affiliate State Farm International Holding Company, Other Affiliate Foreign Securities Trust No. 1, Other Affiliate State Farm EM Equity Trust, Other Affiliate State Farm Lloyds, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm Liquidity Pool LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office Investments Two, LP, Other Affiliate State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, Other Affiliate State Farm Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Life and Accident Assurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Investment Management Corp., Other Affiliate State Farm Equity and Bond Fund (Symbol: SLBAX), Other Affiliate State Farm International Equity Fund (Symbol: SFFAX), Other Affiliate State Farm International Index Fund (Symbol: SIIAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small Cap Index Fund (Symbol: SMIAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small/Mid Cap Equity Fund (Symbol: SFSAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small/Mid Cap Equity Fund (Symbol: SFSAX), Other Affiliate State Farm General Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Gautam, Smita) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Discovery ends on 5/13/2019.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8330056) (Attachments: #1 State Court -Case Filing Info Form, #2 State Court -Complaint, #3 State Court- Summons, #4 State Court- CSC Notice of Service, #5 State Court- Answer - State Farm, #6 State Court - Filing of Removal, #7 Federal Certificate, #8 Affivavit - Kevin Diestel, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITA GAUTAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Thomas Dietrichs