This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2018 at 08:02:30 (UTC).

Lammers v. Pathways to a Better Life, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 Lammers filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Pathways to a Better Life, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01579

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Lammers

Defendants

Pathways to a Better Life, LLC

Pathways to a Better Life LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Summer H Murshid

Attorney at Hawks Quindel SC

222 E Erie St - Ste 210, Po Box 442

Milwaukee, WI 53201-0442

Defendant Attorney

Elizabeth A Odian

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2600

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4115

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) PROTECTIVE ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Murshid, Summer)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

#10

(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2018, Initial Disclosures due by 12/14/2018, Discovery due by 10/15/2019, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 7/1/2019, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 8/16/2019, Motions due by 10/31/2019, Response due by 11/18/2019, Reply due by 12/2/2019 Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2020 01:30 PM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 3/23/2020 08:30 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #120418) (cav)

#9

(#9) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Murshid, Summer)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018 09:30 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pathways to a Better Life LLC.(Odian, Elizabeth)

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE Statement by Pathways to a Better Life LLC. (Odian, Elizabeth)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Odian on behalf of Pathways to a Better Life LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Elizabeth A. Odian (Odian, Elizabeth)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lammers. Pathways to a Better Life LLC served on 10/16/2018. (Murshid, Summer)

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by James Lammers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Murshid, Summer)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PROTECTIVE ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/07/2018. The parties are reminded that they are to comply with General L.R. 79(d) when filing restricted documents under seal. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Murshid, Summer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2018, Initial Disclosures due by 12/14/2018, Discovery due by 10/15/2019, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 7/1/2019, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 8/16/2019, Motions due by 10/31/2019, Response due by 11/18/2019, Reply due by 12/2/2019 Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2020 01:30 PM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 3/23/2020 08:30 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #120418) (cav)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Murshid, Summer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018 09:30 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pathways to a Better Life LLC.(Odian, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE Statement by Pathways to a Better Life LLC. (Odian, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Odian on behalf of Pathways to a Better Life LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Elizabeth A. Odian (Odian, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lammers. Pathways to a Better Life LLC served on 10/16/2018. (Murshid, Summer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by James Lammers. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Murshid, Summer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Pathways to a Better Life, LLC. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by James Lammers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Murshid, Summer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Pathways to a Better Life, LLC by James Lammers. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2939103) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Murshid, Summer)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.