This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2019 at 07:42:11 (UTC).

LaBrec, Matthew v. Weber, Lucas et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 LaBrec, Matthew filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Weber, Lucas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01047

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew LaBrec

Winnebago, WI 54985-0220

Defendants

C/OII Scott

C/O Drennan

C/OII Conroy

C/O Lloyd

LT. Michael Julson

Renee Schueler

C/O Rogalski

Sgt. Kottka

C/OII Roeker

RN Navarro

Sgt. Reeson

C/O Neustadter

C/OII Slama

Dr. Frisch

Dr. Trinidad

C/OII Jezuit

Jonathan Korducki

C/OII Bowar

K. Raatz

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Clerk's Office response to #17 Declaration of Matthew La Brec asking for copy costs due in cases 16-cv-774-jdp, 17-cv-485-jdp, and 18-cv-1047-jdp. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#17

(#17) Declaration of Matthew La Brec re #16 Response to Order. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

16 #1

Envelope

#16

(#16) Response re: #15 Order/Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER that Plaintiff Matthew La Brec may have until February 12, 2019 to respond to this order identifying which lawsuits he wishes to proceed with. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 01/30/2019. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#14

(#14) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#13

(#13) Letter from Clerk's Office regarding Plaintiff's request for copies and copy cost. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 4.92 assessed due 1/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/17/2018. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#10

(#10) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#9

(#9) Declaration of Matthew La Brec re #1 Complaint. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#8

(#8) Declaration of Daniel Compton re #1 Complaint. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#7

(#7) Declaration of Leighton D. Lindsey re #1 Complaint. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

1 #4

Envelope

1 #3

Cover Letter

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1-14, 21-22, 30-36 - DOC Correspondence, Psychological Service Requests,

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Matthew LaBrec. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14, 21-22, 30-36 - DOC Correspondence, Psychological Service Requests, ICE Complaints and Decisions, Interview/Information Requests, Health Service Requests, Notice of Injury and Claim, Disbursement Request, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) (rks) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Clerk's Office response to #17 Declaration of Matthew La Brec asking for copy costs due in cases 16-cv-774-jdp, 17-cv-485-jdp, and 18-cv-1047-jdp. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Declaration of Matthew La Brec re #16 Response to Order. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Response re: #15 Order/Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER that Plaintiff Matthew La Brec may have until February 12, 2019 to respond to this order identifying which lawsuits he wishes to proceed with. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 01/30/2019. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Partial Filing fee received: $ 4.92, receipt number 34690033513. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Letter from Clerk's Office regarding Plaintiff's request for copies and copy cost. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 4.92 assessed due 1/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/17/2018. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Declaration of Matthew La Brec re #1 Complaint. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Declaration of Daniel Compton re #1 Complaint. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Declaration of Leighton D. Lindsey re #1 Complaint. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration of Cody Roberts re #1 Complaint. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration of Leighton D Lindsey re #1 Complaint. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration of Leighton Lindsey re #1 Complaint. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Declaration of Leighton D. Lindsey re #1 Complaint. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Declaration of Leighton D Lindsey re #1 Complaint, (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Matthew LaBrec. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14, 21-22, 30-36 - DOC Correspondence, Psychological Service Requests, ICE Complaints and Decisions, Interview/Information Requests, Health Service Requests, Notice of Injury and Claim, Disbursement Request, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) (rks) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.