This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2018 at 07:57:30 (UTC).

LaBranche v. Nestor I, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 LaBranche filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Nestor I, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Susie Morgan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-08399

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamie LaBranche

Laplace, LA 70068

Defendants

Dean Morris, L.L.C.

Nestor I LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley E. Morris

Attorney at Dean Morris, LLP

1505 North 19Th St.

Monroe, LA 71201

Katie L. Dysart

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Ashley Arnold

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

19 #3

Notice of Submission (Civil Only) Notice of Submission

19 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order

19 #1

Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support

#19

(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Nestor I LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission Notice of Submission)(Arnold, Ashley) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

18 #12

Proposed Order

18 #11

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

18 #10

Exhibit I

18 #9

Exhibit H

18 #8

Exhibit G

18 #7

Exhibit F

18 #6

Exhibit E

18 #5

Exhibit D

18 #4

Exhibit C

18 #3

Exhibit B

18 #2

Exhibit A

18 #1

Memorandum in Support

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dean Morris, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Notice of Submission, #12 Proposed Order)(Morris, Ashley) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

14 #1

Proposed Order

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Nestor I LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission Notice of Submission)(Arnold, Ashley) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dean Morris, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Notice of Submission, #12 Proposed Order)(Morris, Ashley) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Nestor I LLC answer due 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/16/18. (sbs) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Dean Morris, L.L.C. answer due 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/11/18. (sbs) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **Motion should have been linked to the Complaint by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking the motion to the Complaint.**(sbs) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Nestor I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Ashley Arnold added to party Nestor I LLC(pty:dft).(Arnold, Ashley) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (sbs). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.' Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (sbs) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Dean Morris, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Ashley E. Morris added to party Dean Morris, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Morris, Ashley) Modified event on 10/10/2018 (sbs). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Dean Morris, L.L.C. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018; Nestor I LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Return on Nestor I LLC, #2 Original Deficient Return on Dean Morris, LLC)(jls) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Dean Morris, L.L.C., Nestor I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Mailed to Plaintiff w/ cc Pauper order & Pauper Letter)(jls) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request to Re-Issue Summons as to Dean Morris, L.L.C., Nestor I LLC filed by Jamie LaBranche re #1 Complaint. (jls) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #7 Summons Returned. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 10/17/2018. (jls) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) **DEFICIENT** Summons Returned as to Dean Morris, L.L.C., Nestor I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jls) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RICO Case Statement by Jamie LaBranche (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jls) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Dean Morris, L.L.C. and Nestor I LLC. (sent to Plaintiff via USPS w/ cc Pauper order & Pauper Letter) (mp) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: ORDERED that the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on September 10, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rico Standing Order. Signed by Clerk. (bwn) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamie LaBranche. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jeg) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Dean Morris, L.L.C., Nestor I LLC filed by Jamie LaBranche. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(jeg) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEAN MORRIS, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley E. Morris