Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2019 at 07:29:22 (UTC).

LaBarge Realty, LLC et al v. Sand Development, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 LaBarge Realty, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Sand Development, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01904

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LaBarge C&R LLC

LaBarge Realty

LaBarge Realty, LLC

LaBarge C&R, LLC

Defendants

SanD Development LLC

Suzanne Pawlow

LaBarge Coating LLC

David Kersting

David W. Kersting

Sand Development, LLC

Suzanne M. Pawlow

LaBarge Coating, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James F. Monafo

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL, LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Kyle P. Seelbach

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL, LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL, LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant Attorney

Clark W. Hedger

Attorney at GREENSFELDER AND HEMKER, PC

10 S. Broadway, Suite 2000

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Defendants David W. Kersting, LaBarge Coating, LLC, Suzanne M. Pawlow, Sand Development, LLC. (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#24

(#24) ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle P. Seelbach for Plaintiffs LaBarge C&R, LLC, LaBarge Realty, LLC. (Seelbach, Kyle) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#22

(#22) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Defendants David W. Kersting, LaBarge Coating, LLC, Suzanne M. Pawlow, Sand Development, LLC. (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#21

(#21) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case AND ALTERNATIVELY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE PURSUANT TO THE FIRST-FILED RULE, AND FURTHER ALTERNATIVELY TO CONSOLIDATE UNDER LOCAL RULE 4.03 Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively to Transfer, Pursuant to the First-Filed Rule filed by Plaintiffs LaBarge C&R, LLC, LaBarge Realty, LLC. (Seelbach, Kyle) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Case AND ALTERNATIVELY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE PURSUANT TO THE FIRST-FILED RULE, AND FURTHER ALTERNATIVELY TO CONSOLIDATE UNDER LOCAL RULE 4.03 by Defendants David W. Kersting, LaBarge Coating, LLC, Suzanne M. Pawlow, Sand Development, LLC. (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

18 #3

Exhibit 2 - Memorandum and Order

18 #2

Exhibit 1 - Part 2 Declaration of Pierre LaBarge, III

18 #1

Exhibit 1 - Part 1 Declaration of Pierre LaBarge, III

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to the First-Filed Rule filed by Plaintiffs LaBarge C&R, LLC, LaBarge Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 Declaration of Pierre LaBarge, III, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 Declaration of Pierre LaBarge, III, #3 Exhibit 2 - Memorandum and Order)(Monafo, James) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Suzanne M. Pawlow Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#3

(#9) Docket Text ORDER: as to Suzanne M. Pawlow Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Suzanne M. Pawlow. (Hedger, Clark) ; ORDERED GRANTED, Suzanne M. Pawlow answer due 12/4/2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/29/18. (JAB) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Suzanne Pawlow Sent To: Plaintiff (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

1 #5

Original Filing Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Ex C-Notice filed in TX

1 #2

Exhibit Ex B-Pawlow declaration

1 #1

Exhibit Ex A-State Court File

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st JC-St. Louis County, case number 18SL-CC03673, with receipt number 0865-6866296, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Suzanne Pawlow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A-State Court File, #2 Exhibit Ex B-Pawlow declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex C-Notice filed in TX, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Defendants David W. Kersting, LaBarge Coating, LLC, Suzanne M. Pawlow, Sand Development, LLC. (Hedger, Clark) ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 1/14/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/3/2019. (CLO) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Defendants David W. Kersting, LaBarge Coating, LLC, Suzanne M. Pawlow, Sand Development, LLC. (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle P. Seelbach for Plaintiffs LaBarge C&R, LLC, LaBarge Realty, LLC. (Seelbach, Kyle) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Defendants David W. Kersting, LaBarge Coating, LLC, Suzanne M. Pawlow, Sand Development, LLC. ( Response to Court due by 1/7/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/2/19. (KKS) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Defendants David W. Kersting, LaBarge Coating, LLC, Suzanne M. Pawlow, Sand Development, LLC. (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case AND ALTERNATIVELY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE PURSUANT TO THE FIRST-FILED RULE, AND FURTHER ALTERNATIVELY TO CONSOLIDATE UNDER LOCAL RULE 4.03 Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively to Transfer, Pursuant to the First-Filed Rule filed by Plaintiffs LaBarge C&R, LLC, LaBarge Realty, LLC. (Seelbach, Kyle) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case AND ALTERNATIVELY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE PURSUANT TO THE FIRST-FILED RULE, AND FURTHER ALTERNATIVELY TO CONSOLIDATE UNDER LOCAL RULE 4.03 filed by Defendants David W. Kersting, LaBarge Coating, LLC, Suzanne M. Pawlow, Sand Development, LLC. (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Dismiss Case AND ALTERNATIVELY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE PURSUANT TO THE FIRST-FILED RULE, AND FURTHER ALTERNATIVELY TO CONSOLIDATE UNDER LOCAL RULE 4.03 by Defendants David W. Kersting, LaBarge Coating, LLC, Suzanne M. Pawlow, Sand Development, LLC. (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to the First-Filed Rule filed by Plaintiffs LaBarge C&R, LLC, LaBarge Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 Declaration of Pierre LaBarge, III, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 Declaration of Pierre LaBarge, III, #3 Exhibit 2 - Memorandum and Order)(Monafo, James) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Court filed by Plaintiffs LaBarge C&R, LLC, LaBarge Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Charles Clark)(Monafo, James) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docket Text ORDER: as to Suzanne M. Pawlow Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Suzanne M. Pawlow. (Hedger, Clark) ; ORDERED GRANTED, Suzanne M. Pawlow answer due 12/4/2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/29/18. (JAB) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Court by Defendant Suzanne M. Pawlow. (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Court filed by Plaintiffs LaBarge C&R, LLC, LaBarge Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hurtt, Robert) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Court by Plaintiffs LaBarge C&R, LLC, LaBarge Realty, LLC. (Hurtt, Robert) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Suzanne M. Pawlow. (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Suzanne M. Pawlow Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by LaBarge C&R, LLC, LaBarge Realty, LLC.(MFG) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Suzanne Pawlow Sent To: Plaintiff (Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st JC-St. Louis County, case number 18SL-CC03673, with receipt number 0865-6866296, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Suzanne Pawlow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A-State Court File, #2 Exhibit Ex B-Pawlow declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex C-Notice filed in TX, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Hedger, Clark) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LaBarge is a litigant

Latest cases where LABARGE COATING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James F. Monafo