This case was last updated from PACER on 04/28/2016 at 02:10:32 (UTC).

L-R et al v. JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2015 L-R filed an Other lawsuit against JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Boasberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00011

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Boasberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

C. M. A-C

W. M. C.

J. P. L-M

R. I. L-R

G. A. P-C

G. C. R.

J. A. R.

Z. M. R.

J. L. S.

K. L. S.

Defendants

JEH CHARLES JOHNSON

PHILIP T. MILLER

SARAH R. SALDANA

THOMAS S. WINKOWSKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip J. Levitz

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One Citycenter

Washington, DC 20001

Arthur B. Spitzer

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE NATION'S CAPITAL

4301 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 434

Washington, DC 20008

David M. Zionts

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One Citycenter

Washington, DC 20001

Judy Rabinovitz

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Dennis B. Auerbach

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One Citycenter

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant Attorneys

Wynne Patrick Kelly

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth St., N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Sarah B. Fabian

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 868

Washington, DC 20044

Leon Fresco

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Room 3219

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

40 #1

Press Release

#40

(#40) NOTICE to Court by JEH CHARLES JOHNSON, PHILIP T. MILLER, SARAH R. SALDANA (Attachments: #1 Press Release)(Fabian, Sarah) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

#41

(#41) Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference of May 28, 2015 by C. M. A-C, W. M. C., J. P. L-M, R. I. L-R, G. A. P-C, G. C. R., J. A. R., Z. M. R., J. L. S., K. L. S. (Auerbach, Dennis) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

#42

(#42) MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Fabian, Sarah) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

#43

(#43) ORDER: Based on the parties' joint proposal, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The February 20, 2015, preliminary injunction and associated orders are DISSOLVED, except the portions of such orders and opinions granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Class Certification; and 2) The case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED, subject to the conditions laid out in this Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/29/2015. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER granting # 1 Sealed UNOPPOSED Motion TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/24/2014. (rdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against JEH CHARLES JOHNSON, PHILIP T. MILLER, THOMAS S. WINKOWSKI ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616067754) filed by W. M. C., K. L. S., C. M. A-C, J. L. S., G. A. P-C, R. I. L-R, Z. M. R., J. P. L-M. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#5) LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by C. M. A-C, W. M. C., J. P. L-M, R. I. L-R, G. A. P-C, Z. M. R., J. L. S., K. L. S. # 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by W. M. C., Z. M. R., J. P. L-M, J. L. S., K. L. S., R. I. L-R, C. M. A-C, G. A. P-C.(Exhibit 1- Brane Declaration) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A- Bran CV and Publications, # 2 Exhibit 2- Memorandum for Regional Directors from Michael A. Pearson, Executive Associate Commissioner, INS, # 3 Exhibit 3- Declaration of Valerie Burch, # 4 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Barbara Hines, # 5 Exhibit 4A- Miller and Lembke Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4B- Karnes Conditions Complaint Letter, # 7 Exhibit 5- Declaration of Allegra McLeod, # 8 Exhibit 5A- McLeod CV, # 9 Exhibit 6- Declaration of Virginia Raymond, # 10 Exhibit 7- In re Z-R & C-Z, at 4 (DOJ, EOIR Oct. 7, 2014), # 11 Exhibit 8- Declaration of Matthew Archambeault, # 12 Exhibit 9- Declaration of R.I.L.R. (redacted), # 13 Exhibit 10- Declaration of Z.M.R. (redacted), # 14 Exhibit 11- Declaration of J.L.P.M. (redacted), # 15 Exhibit 12- Declaration of W.M.C. (redacted), # 16 Exhibit 13- Declaration of Jonathan Hiskey, # 17 Exhibit 13A- Violence and Migration in Central America, # 18 Exhibit 13B- Hiskey CV, # 19 Exhibit 13C- Miller and Lembke Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 14- Declaration of Nestor Rodriguez, # 21 Exhibit 14A- Rodriguez CV, # 22 Exhibit 15- Declaration of Luis H. Zayas, # 23 Exhibit 15A- Zayas CV, # 24 Exhibit 15B- Abram et al., 2014 incarcerated youth, # 25 Exhibit 15C- Byrne et al., 2012, # 26 Exhibit 15D- Dallaire et al., 2014, # 27 Exhibit 15E- Foster & Hagan, 2013, # 28 Exhibit 15F- McLaughlin et al., 2014 neural development, # 29 Exhibit 15G- Murray & Farrington, 2005, # 30 Exhibit 15H- Nesbit & Ruland, 2008)(rdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

5 #14

*Restricted*

5 #13

Exhibit 10- Declaration of Z.M.R. (redacted)

5 #8

Exhibit 5A- McLeod CV

5 #7

Exhibit 5- Declaration of Allegra McLeod

5 #6

Exhibit 4B- Karnes Conditions Complaint Letter

5 #3

Exhibit 3- Declaration of Valerie Burch

173 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER: Based on the parties' joint proposal, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The February 20, 2015, preliminary injunction and associated orders are DISSOLVED, except the portions of such orders and opinions granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Class Certification; and 2) The case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED, subject to the conditions laid out in this Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/29/2015. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Fabian, Sarah) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 6/22/2015. (By 6/26/2015, the parties shall submit a joint notice regarding future proceedings). (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (ad) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that by June 26, 2015, the parties shall submit a joint notice regarding future proceedings. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/22/15.(lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference RESCHEDULED for 6/22/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (tg) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' Joint #41 Motion to Continue. The Court ORDERS that the status conference previously set for May 28, 2015, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED to June 22, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/27/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference of May 28, 2015 by C. M. A-C, W. M. C., J. P. L-M, R. I. L-R, G. A. P-C, G. C. R., J. A. R., Z. M. R., J. L. S., K. L. S. (Auerbach, Dennis) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 5/28/2015, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 19, before Judge James E. Boasberg. (ad) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: Given the filing of the Government's #40 Notice, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a status hearing on May 28, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall be prepared to address the effect of the Notice on the Government's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/18/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE to Court by JEH CHARLES JOHNSON, PHILIP T. MILLER, SARAH R. SALDANA (Attachments: #1 Press Release)(Fabian, Sarah) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by W. M. C., K. L. S., C. M. A-C, J. L. S., G. A. P-C, R. I. L-R, Z. M. R., J. P. L-M. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Auerbach, Dennis) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting # 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of DAVID MEIR ZIONTS. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/08/15. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing fee in the Amount $ 100, receipt number 4616067755 re # 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (rdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David Meir Zionts, :Firm- Covington & Burling LLP, :Address- One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - (202) 662-5987. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by C. M. A-C, W. M. C., J. P. L-M, R. I. L-R, G. A. P-C, Z. M. R., J. L. S., K. L. S. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Certify Class by C. M. A-C, W. M. C., J. P. L-M, R. I. L-R, G. A. P-C, Z. M. R., J. L. S., K. L. S. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Levitz Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Tan Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Connell Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by C. M. A-C, W. M. C., J. P. L-M, R. I. L-R, G. A. P-C, Z. M. R., J. L. S., K. L. S. # 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by W. M. C., Z. M. R., J. P. L-M, J. L. S., K. L. S., R. I. L-R, C. M. A-C, G. A. P-C.(Exhibit 1- Brane Declaration) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A- Bran CV and Publications, # 2 Exhibit 2- Memorandum for Regional Directors from Michael A. Pearson, Executive Associate Commissioner, INS, # 3 Exhibit 3- Declaration of Valerie Burch, # 4 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Barbara Hines, # 5 Exhibit 4A- Miller and Lembke Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4B- Karnes Conditions Complaint Letter, # 7 Exhibit 5- Declaration of Allegra McLeod, # 8 Exhibit 5A- McLeod CV, # 9 Exhibit 6- Declaration of Virginia Raymond, # 10 Exhibit 7- In re Z-R & C-Z, at 4 (DOJ, EOIR Oct. 7, 2014), # 11 Exhibit 8- Declaration of Matthew Archambeault, # 12 Exhibit 9- Declaration of R.I.L.R. (redacted), # 13 Exhibit 10- Declaration of Z.M.R. (redacted), # 14 Exhibit 11- Declaration of J.L.P.M. (redacted), # 15 Exhibit 12- Declaration of W.M.C. (redacted), # 16 Exhibit 13- Declaration of Jonathan Hiskey, # 17 Exhibit 13A- Violence and Migration in Central America, # 18 Exhibit 13B- Hiskey CV, # 19 Exhibit 13C- Miller and Lembke Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 14- Declaration of Nestor Rodriguez, # 21 Exhibit 14A- Rodriguez CV, # 22 Exhibit 15- Declaration of Luis H. Zayas, # 23 Exhibit 15A- Zayas CV, # 24 Exhibit 15B- Abram et al., 2014 incarcerated youth, # 25 Exhibit 15C- Byrne et al., 2012, # 26 Exhibit 15D- Dallaire et al., 2014, # 27 Exhibit 15E- Foster & Hagan, 2013, # 28 Exhibit 15F- McLaughlin et al., 2014 neural development, # 29 Exhibit 15G- Murray & Farrington, 2005, # 30 Exhibit 15H- Nesbit & Ruland, 2008)(rdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by C. M. A-C, W. M. C., J. P. L-M, R. I. L-R, G. A. P-C, Z. M. R., J. L. S., K. L. S. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against JEH CHARLES JOHNSON, PHILIP T. MILLER, THOMAS S. WINKOWSKI ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616067754) filed by W. M. C., K. L. S., C. M. A-C, J. L. S., G. A. P-C, R. I. L-R, Z. M. R., J. P. L-M. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting # 1 Sealed UNOPPOSED Motion TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/24/2014. (rdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SEALED UNOPPOSED MOTION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY filed by C. M. A-C, W. M. C., J. P. L-M, R. I. L-R, PHILIP T. MILLER, G. A. P-C, Z. M. R., J. L. S., K. L. S. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1- Declaration of R.I.L.R., # 3 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Z.M.R., # 4 Exhibit 3- Declaration of J.L.P.M., # 5 Exhibit 4- Declaration of W.M.C., # 6 Exhibit 5- List of Plaintiffs Names, Alien Numbers, and Pseudonyms, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less