This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2019 at 01:39:49 (UTC).

Kuter et al v. Michigan State University et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Kuter filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michigan State University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon J. Quist and Ellen S. Carmody. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01006

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon J. Quist

Referral Judge

Ellen S. Carmody

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joseph Kuter

Jaclyn Bowe

Defendants

Lianna Hadden

Michigan State University

Jeffrey R. Kovan

MSU Sports Medicine Clinic

Brooke Lemmen

Destiny Teachnor-Hauk

Lawrence G. Nassar

Kathie Klages

Douglas Dietzel

Gary E. Stollak

William D. Strampel

Lou Anna Simon

Michigan State University Board of Trustees

Gary Stollak

William Strampel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert J. Lantzy

Attorney at Buckfire & Buckfire, PC

25800 Northwestern Hwy., Ste. 8900

Southfield, MI 48075

Defendant Attorneys

Lee T. Silver

Attorney at Silver & Van Essen PC

300 Ottawa Ave., Nw, Ste. 620

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Michael L. Gutierrez

Attorney at Silver & Van Essen PC

300 Ottawa Ave., Nw, Ste. 620

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Jessica Anne Frogge

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

155 N Wacker Dr., Ste. 2700

Chicago, IL 60606-1720

Megan P. Norris

Attorney at Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone PLC (Detroit)

150 W Jefferson Ave., Ste. 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-4415

Amy Lynn Van Gelder

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

155 N Wacker Dr., Ste. 2700

Chicago, IL 60606-1720

Brian Mark Schwartz

Attorney at Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone PLC (Detroit)

150 W Jefferson Ave., Ste. 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-4415

Patrick J. Fitzgerald

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

155 N Wacker Dr., Ste. 2700

Chicago, IL 60606-1720

Albert L. Hogan, III

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

155 N Wacker Dr., Ste. 2700

Chicago, IL 60606-1720

Scott Robert Eldridge

Attorney at Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone PLC (Lansing)

One Michigan Ave., Ste. 900

Lansing, MI 48933

Ashley Evaline Racette

Attorney at Kerr Russell & Weber PLC

500 Woodward Ave., Ste. 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-3427

Fred K. Herrmann

Attorney at Kerr Russell & Weber PLC

500 Woodward Ave., Ste. 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-3427

Daniel J. Ferris

Attorney at Kerr Russell & Weber PLC

500 Woodward Ave., Ste. 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-3427

Patrick F. Hickey

Attorney at Hickey Hauck Bishoff & Jeffers, PLLC

One Woodward Ave., Ste. 2000

Detroit, MI 48226

Andrew M. Gonyea

Attorney at Hickey Hauck Bishoff & Jeffers, PLLC

One Woodward Ave., Ste. 2000

Detroit, MI 48226

Audrey J. Forbush

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney (Flint)

111 E Court St., Ste. 1B

Flint, MI 48502

Peter D. Cronk, Jr.

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney (Lansing)

325 E Grand River, Ste. 250

East Lansing, MI 48823

Scott Louis Feuer

Attorney at Law Offices of Scott L. Feuer PC

888 W Big Beaver Rd., Ste. 850

Troy, MI 48084

Maria Cesira Fracassa Dwyer

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC (Detroit)

500 Woodward Ave., Ste. 3500

Detroit, MI 48226-3435

Marshall W. Grate

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC (Grand Rapids)

200 Ottawa Ave., Nw, Ste. 500

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#891

No Description Available

#868

No Description Available

#862

No Description Available

#199

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#164

No Description Available

115 #675

No Description Available

#248

No Description Available

#222

No Description Available

148 #531

No Description Available

142 #1

Proposed Order

136 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Statute

77 #5

Exhibit E

#69

No Description Available

916 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#649) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John R9 Doe re 1041 re MOTION for order to Remove Next Friend(1041 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#648) MOTION for order to Remove Next Friend (re 1:18-cv-997) by plaintiff John R9 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#647) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-1001) filed by plaintiff Samantha Schneider ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Spagnuolo, James) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#646) ORDER granting STIPULATION (1038) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#645) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1016) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#644) ORDER GRANTING MOTION (974) FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#643) ORDER FOR JUDGE'S COPIES: Copies to be submitted within 7 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#642) ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (1030), (1032), (1033) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#641) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS (910), (940) FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#640) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
649 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (ems) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Lantzy, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Maria Cesira Fracassa Dwyer on behalf of defendant William Strampel (Dwyer, Maria) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (ems). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Robert Eldridge on behalf of defendants MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Eldridge, Scott) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Marshall W. Grate on behalf of defendant William Strampel (Grate, Marshall) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (ems). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Steven F. Stapleton on behalf of defendant William Strampel (Stapleton, Steven) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (ems). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is cognate to 1:17-cv-29 (jlb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew M. Gonyea on behalf of defendants Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk (Gonyea, Andrew) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4228255; for civil filing fee (jlb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Joseph Kuter, Jaclyn Bowe (Lantzy, Robert) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (ems). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less