This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2018 at 07:35:35 (UTC).

Krueger v. Stively

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 Krueger filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Stively. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00406

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabrielle Krueger

Defendant

Jason Stively

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deborah V. Dunn

Attorney at PERKINS COIE

1111 West Jefferson Street, Suite 500

Boise, ID 83702

Alison C. Hunter

Attorney at PERKINS COIE

1111 West Jefferson Street, Suite 500

Boise, ID 83702

Keely E. Duke

Attorney at Duke Scanlan & Hall, PLLC

P.O. Box 7387, 1087 West River Street, Suite 300

Boise, ID 83707

Aubrey Dean Lyon

Attorney at Duke Scanlan & Hall, PLLC

1087 West River Street, Suite 300

Boise, ID 83702

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas E. Dvorak

Attorney at GIVENS PURSLEY LLP

601 West Bannock Street

Boise, ID 83702

Thomas E Dvorak

Attorney at GIVENS PURSLEY

Po Box 2720

Boise, ID 83701-2720

Jason Blakley

Attorney at Givens Pursley LLP

601 W Bannock Street

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Blakley on behalf of Jason Stively (Blakley, Jason)

#11

(#11) AMENDED LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset for 12/17/2018 10:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. On or before 12/10/18, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Motion to Amend Notice of Removal and Answer Thomas E Dvorak appearing for Defendant Jason Stively. Responses due by 11/28/2018 (Dvorak, Thomas)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Seal Thomas E Dvorak appearing for Defendant Jason Stively. Responses due by 11/28/2018 (Dvorak, Thomas)

7 #8

Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 5)

7 #7

Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 4)

7 #6

Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 3)

7 #5

Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 2)

7 #4

Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 1)

7 #3

Affidavit of Robert Bass

7 #2

Affidavit of Michael Ballantyne

7 #1

Affidavit of Jason Stively

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Jason Stively. Replies due by 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason Stively, #2 Affidavit of Michael Ballantyne, #3 Affidavit of Robert Bass, #4 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 1), #5 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 2), #6 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 3), #7 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 4), #8 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 5))(Dvorak, Thomas)

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff Gabrielle Krueger. Responses due by 11/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Duke, Keely)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Keely E. Duke,Aubrey Dean Lyon for Gabrielle Krueger added. Attorney Deborah V. Dunn and Alison C. Hunter terminated. (Duke, Keely)

#4

(#4) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 11/20/2018 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 10:30 AM in Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Blakley on behalf of Jason Stively (Blakley, Jason)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset for 12/17/2018 10:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. On or before 12/10/18, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Motion to Amend Notice of Removal and Answer Thomas E Dvorak appearing for Defendant Jason Stively. Responses due by 11/28/2018 (Dvorak, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Sealed Document Re: #7 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #8 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 2), #2 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 3))(Dvorak, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Seal Thomas E Dvorak appearing for Defendant Jason Stively. Responses due by 11/28/2018 (Dvorak, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Jason Stively. Replies due by 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason Stively, #2 Affidavit of Michael Ballantyne, #3 Affidavit of Robert Bass, #4 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 1), #5 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 2), #6 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 3), #7 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 4), #8 Affidavit of Thomas E. Dvorak (part 5))(Dvorak, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Remand Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff Gabrielle Krueger. Responses due by 11/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Duke, Keely)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Keely E. Duke,Aubrey Dean Lyon for Gabrielle Krueger added. Attorney Deborah V. Dunn and Alison C. Hunter terminated. (Duke, Keely)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 11/20/2018 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 10:30 AM in Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Jason Stively.(Dvorak, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Gabrielle Krueger, Jason Stively re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/23/2018. (km)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Jason Stively served on 9/17/2018. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (km)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jason Stively from Ada County, Idaho District Court, case number CV01-18-15672.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1786763.), filed by Jason Stively. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint filed in Ada County District Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons Issued, #3 Exhibit 3 - Acceptance of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ada County Court Docket, #5 Cover Sheet Jason Stively Civil Cover Sheet)(Dvorak, Thomas) Modified on 9/24/2018 to update exhibit descriptions (km).

    Read MoreRead Less