This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2018 at 07:44:16 (UTC).

Krocka v. Mutual of New York Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 Krocka filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Mutual of New York Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David N. Hurd and David E. Peebles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00830

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David N. Hurd

Referral Judge

David E. Peebles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent J. Krocka

Phoenix, AZ 85086

Defendant

Mutual of New York Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Katherine L. Villanueva

Attorney at Drinker, Biddle Law Firm - Philadelphia Office

One Logan Square, 18Th And Cherry Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103-6996

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#9

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

7 #2

Certification of Service

7 #1

Memorandum of Law

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Summons Issued as to MONY Mutual of New York (in Syracuse)

#2

1 #2

Civil Coversheet

1 #1

Affidavit of Michael Sperber

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT NOTICE regarding plaintiff's #12 and #13 Letter Motions concerning Mediation: Defendant's counsel is directed to file a Response to plaintiff's motion on or before 9/11/2018. A determination will thereafter be made by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. (Served plaintiff by regular mail). (sal ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Letter Motion dated 8/17/2018 filed by Vincent J. Krocka, Pro Se requesting Leave to Appeal Telephonically, with sufficient notice to him so that his prison counselor (Mr. Griffin) can coordinate it, submitted to Judge David E. Peebles. (jmb) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter Motion dated 8/17/2018 filed by Vincent J. Krocka, Pro se requesting to Advance Case to Mediation, submitted to Judge Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. (jmb) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO THE COURT: providing contact information for his Prison Counselor, filed by Vincent J. Krocka, Pro Se. (jmb) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketServed plaintiff by regular mail with a copy of the text order entered on 8/16/18. (sal ) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER: Based upon the pending motion to dismiss, the in person Initial Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse is adjourned without date. The deadline for filing a Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of mandatory disclosures is stayed at this time. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 8/16/2018. (sal ) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mutual of New York Insurance Company. (Villanueva, Katherine) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Mutual of New York Insurance Company re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Villanueva, Katherine) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2018 10:00 AM in Utica before Judge David N. Hurd Response to Motion due by 9/11/2018 Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/17/2018. filed by Mutual of New York Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certification of Service) (Villanueva, Katherine) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent J. Krocka. Mutual of New York Insurance Company served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. (jmb) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO SE NOTICE returned executed by Vincent J. Krocka. (jmb) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and mailed to the pro se plaintiff, along with a copy of the Local Rules, Lawyer Referral Services List, and an extra signed copy of the Notice for the plaintiff to keep for his records. {Documents sent to the plaintiff via regular mail at FCI Phoenix, 37910 N. 45th Ave., Phoenix, AZ 85086}. (rep) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/4/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Copies of the General Order were provided to the process server who was filing on behalf of the plaintiff. One copy was provided to be returned to the plaintiff, and the other copies were provided for service upon the defendant. (rep) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Mutual of New York Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to MONY Mutual of New York (in Syracuse)). {Copies of the issued summonses for service were provided to the process server who brought in the Complaint for filing on behalf of the plaintiff}.(rep) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT: Against Mutual of New York Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number SYR052820), filed by Vincent J. Krocka, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Sperber, #2 Civil Coversheet)(rep) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2018: #3 Proposed Summons) (rep, ). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mutual of New York Insurance Company, AKA MONY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine L. Villanueva Esq.