This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 17:37:17 (UTC).

Kotalik v. A.H. Bennett Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 Kotalik filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A H Bennett Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Alice R. Senechal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00246

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Alice R. Senechal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dorothy Kotalik

Defendants

Foster Wheeler LLC

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Goodin Company

General Engineering Development Corporation

Industrial Holdings Corporation

Greybar Electric Company, Inc.

A.H. Bennett Company

Cleaver Brooks

The Jamar Company

A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc.

A.W. Chesterton Company

General Electric Company

Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.

Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company

Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.

Border States Industries, Inc.

McMaster Carr Supply Company

Apollo Piping Supply, Inc.

Foster Products Corporation

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeanette Boechler

Attorney at Boechler, P.C.

300 Np Ave., Ste. 101

Fargo, ND 58107

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew R. Thibodeau

Attorney at Thibodeau, Johnson & Feriancek

302 West Superior Street, Suite 800

Duluth, MN 55802

David E. Scouton

Attorney at Thibodeau, Johnson & Feriancek

302 West Superior Street, Suite 800

Duluth, MN 55802

Heather H. Neubauer

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jason Mohr

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Kyle B. Mansfield

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

1200 Marquette Plaza, 250 Marquette Ave

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Joanna M. Salmen

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jon P. Parrington

Attorney at Pustorino, Tilton, Parrington & Lindquist, PLLC

6600 France Avenue South, Ste. 680

Minneapolis, MN 55435

Roland John Wells, III

Attorney at HKM

30 E. 7Th Street, Suite 3200

St. Paul, MN 55101

Richard J. Leighton

Attorney at Johnson Killen & Seiler PA

800 Wells Fargo Center, 230 W Superior St

Duluth, MN 55802

Todd E. Zimmerman

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron P.A. (Fargo)

51 Broadway North, Suite 400

Fargo, ND 58102

David D. Schweigert

Attorney at Schweigert, Klemin & McBride, P.C.

116 N. 2Nd Street, Po Box 955

Bismarck, ND 58502

Thomas D. Jensen

Attorney at Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson PA

1300 At&T Tower, 901 Marquette Ave S

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Scott J. Landa

Attorney at Zimney Foster PC

3100 S Columbia Rd, Suite 200

Grand Forks, ND 58201

Other Attorneys

Paul Rudell Oppegard

Attorney at Oppegard Law Firm

2901 South Frontage Road, Po Box 657

Moorhead, MN 56561

Constance N. Hofland

Attorney at ZUGER KIRMIS & SMITH

316 N 5 St, Po Box 1695

Bismarck, ND 58502-1695

Jane L. Dynes

Attorney at Serkland Law Firm, P.C.

10 Roberts St., P.O. Box 6017

Fargo, ND 58108-6017

Joel A. Flom

Attorney at Flom Law Office, P.A.

1703 32Nd Avenue South

Fargo, ND 58103

Jesse D. Mondry

Attorney at Maslon LLP

3300 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South 7Th St.

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4140

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#89

64 #11

Exhibit Deposition of Gordon W. Hvidsten, reported December 10, 1984, in Robert

64 #9

Exhibit A.H. Bennett Company;'s Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of In

64 #8

Exhibit Transcript of Trial Testimony of Dr. Barry I. Castleman, April 28, 2016,

64 #7

Exhibit Defendant Owens-Corning Fiberglas Corporation's Responses to Plaint

64 #6

Exhibit Correspondence dated June 2, 1964, from John P. Harrington, Industrial I

64 #3

Exhibit Deposition of John J. Kotalilk, deceased, reported January 2, 2014

64 #1

Exhibit North Dakota District Court Complaint, Dorothy Kotalik v. A.H. Bennett C

#64

1 #49

Exhibit 26-RSCC Wire Cable Co.'s Amended Answer

1 #48

Exhibit 25-RSCC Wire Cable Co.'s Answer

1 #27

Exhibit 4-Answer of A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc.

1 #22

Exhibit 22-Partial Deposition of William C. Sornsin, Sr.

1 #21

Exhibit 21-Partial Deposition of Bruce Bergson

1 #18

Exhibit 18-partial Deposition of Rudolph Opp

1 #15

Exhibit 15-Partial Deposition of James Nodsle

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Work History of John Kotalik

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Summons and Commplaint

154 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT 11 -- Complete Transcript of the Deposition of Gordon W. Hvidsten, reported December 10, 1984, in Robert Hagen v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al., North Dakota District court, to document: #64 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,,,, by Dorothy Kotalik. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT 5 -- Complete Transcript of the Deposition of William C. Sornsin, Sr., reported September 28, 1983, in Marjorie Matthews et. al., v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al., to document: #64 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,,,, by Dorothy Kotalik. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT 3 -- Complete Transcript of Deposition of John J. Kotalik, deceased, Reported January 2, 2014 to document: #64 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,,,, by Dorothy Kotalik. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #84 Notice of Appearance. Error in document. Clerk's office restricted access to document. (am) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Scouton on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (am) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler LLC. (Scouton, David) Modified on 1/16/2019 to correct corporate parent information. NEF regenerated (am). (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) *RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Scouton on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Scouton, David) Modified on 1/16/2019 to restrict access(am). (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) Modified on 1/16/2019 to correct docket text. NEF regenerated (am). (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Thibodeau on behalf of Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 Signed Pleading) (am). Modified on 1/16/2019 to attach signed pleading and to replace Main Document 82 to replace it with non-fillable PDF. NEF regenerated (am). (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) Modified on 1/16/2019 to correct docket text. NEF regenerated (am). (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 18 - Deposition of Rudolph Opp 10-15-1991 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 17 - Deposition of James Matthews 3-24-82 vol. 2 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 16 - Deposition of James Matthews 3-24-82 vol. 1 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 15 - Deposition of James Nodsle 1-25-1983 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 14 - Deposition of Andrew Olerud Jr. 12-05-1991 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 12 - Deposition of William Sornsin 6-30-87 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. Partial deposition transcripts were filed as Exhibit Nos. 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 20, 21 and 22. Per Local Rule, filer should re-file complete transcripts using the Supplement event and link to document #1 . (cjs) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (cjs) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by A.H. Bennett Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. from Cass County District Cout, case number 09-2018-CV-3765. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 119000249 filed by A.H. Bennett Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons and Commplaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3-Work History of John Kotalik, #4 Exhibit 4-Deposition of John Kotalik 1/2/2014, #5 Exhibit 5-Deposition of John Kotalik 3/21/2014, #6 Exhibit 6-Concluding Order and Judgment, #7 Exhibit 7-Article re: History of Grand Forks Air Force Base, #8 Exhibit 8-Public Law 161, #9 Exhibit 9-Public Law 85-685, #10 Exhibit 10-Public Law 87-554, #11 Exhibit 11-Article from Lincoln Star Journal, #12 Exhibit 12-Partial deposition of William Sornsin, #13 Exhibit 13-Partial Deposition of Andrew I. Olerud, Jr., #14 Exhibit 14-Partial Deposition of Andrew Olerud, Jr., #15 Exhibit 15-Partial Deposition of James Nodsle, #16 Exhibit 16-Partial Deposition of James Alex Matthews, #17 Exhibit 17-Partial Deposition of James Alex Matthews, #18 Exhibit 18-partial Deposition of Rudolph Opp, #19 Exhibit 19-Declaration of Kyle Dotson, #20 Exhibit 20-Partial Deposition of Rudolph F. Opp, #21 Exhibit 21-Partial Deposition of Bruce Bergson, #22 Exhibit 22-Partial Deposition of William C. Sornsin, Sr., #23 Affidavit of Heather H. Neubauer, #24 Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint, #25 Exhibit 2-Answer of A.H. Bennett Company, #26 Exhibit 3-Demand for Change of Judge, #27 Exhibit 4-Answer of A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc., #28 Exhibit 5-Answer of Thomas Kuettel, #29 Exhibit 6-Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Bayer Cropscience, Inc., #30 Exhibit 7-Answer of Border States Industries, Inc., #31 Exhibit 8-Answer of Carol Cable Company, #32 Exhibit 9-Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Certainteed Corporation, #33 Exhibit 10-Answer of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., #34 Exhibit 11-Separate Answer of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., #35 Exhibit 12-Separate Answer of Fargo Moorhead Insulation Company, #36 Exhibit 13-Answer of Foster Wheeler, LLC, #37 Exhibit 14-Foster Wheeler LLC's Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, #38 Exhibit 15-Answer of General Engineering Development, #39 Exhibit 16-Answer of Goodin Company, #40 Exhibit 17-Answer and Defenses of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #41 Exhibit 18-Separate Answer and Demand for Jury Trial of Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc., #42 Exhibit 19-Answer and Defenses of Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc., #43 Exhibit 20-Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc.'s Request for Admission, Interrogatories, #44 Exhibit 21-Answer of Paul W. Abbott, #45 Exhibit 22-Paul W. Abbott's Discovery to Plaintiff, #46 Exhibit 23-Plaintiff's Response to Owens Illinois Request for Admissions, #47 Exhibit 24-Answer of Riley Power Inc., #48 Exhibit 25-RSCC Wire Cable Co.'s Answer, #49 Exhibit 26-RSCC Wire Cable Co.'s Amended Answer, #50 Exhibit 27-Singer Safety Company's Answer, #51 Exhibit 28-Union Carbide's Answer, #52 Exhibit 29-Walker Jamar Co.'s Answer, #53 Exhibit 30-Weil McLain's Answer, #54 Exhibit 31-Zurn Industries' Answer, #55 Exhibit 32-Answer of Crane Co., #56 Exhibit 33-Ingersoll Rand Company's Answer, #57 Exhibit 34-Praxair's Answer to Complaint, #58 Exhibit 35-Trane's Answer to Complaint, #59 Exhibit 36-Jamar Company's Answer, #60 Exhibit 37-Hughes Letter to Boechler, #61 Certificate of Service, #62 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Border States Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Foster Products Corporation is a litigant