This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al v. ASUSTeK Computer Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Koninklijke Philips N filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01886

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Counter Claimants and Intervenor Defendants

U.S. Philips Corporation

Koninklijke Philips N.V.

Defendants

ASUS Computer International

Asustek Computer Inc.

Counter Defendants and Intervenors

Microsoft Corporation

Microsoft Mobile Oy

Microsoft Mobile Inc.

Counter Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant

Microsoft Mobile Oy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Claimant and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin A. Smyth

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Joyce L. Nadipuram

Natalie Lieber

Sean M. McCarthy

Jonathan M. Sharret

Attorney at Fitzpatrick, Cella, Harper and Cinto

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

Michael P. Sandonato

Attorney at Fitzpatrick, Cella, Harper and Scinto

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

Daniel A. Apgar

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104-3800

Jaime F Cardenas-Navia

John D. Carlin

Attorney at Fitzpatrick Cella Harper & Scinto

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, CA 10104

Julian G. Pymento,

Attorney at Fitzpatrick, Cella, Harper, and Scinto

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York City, NY 10104

Nicole Yvonne Stoddard

Robert S. Pickens

Defendant Attorneys

Rodger Dallery Smith, II

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Sang (Michael) Lee

Counter Defendant and Intervenor Attorneys

Andrew Colin Mayo

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Chad S. Campbell

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

2901 North Central Avenue, Suite 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2755

Christina J McCullough

Attorney at Perkins Colie LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Jared W. Crop

Patrick J. McKeever

Sarah E. Stahnke

43 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#363

(#363) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12392537.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/30/2018 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Gerson, Christopher) (Filed on 5/30/2018) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

#362

(#362) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12382616.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/24/2018 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Lieber, Natalie) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

#361

(#361) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12381232.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Suarez, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

#360

(#360) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12381189.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Thomason, Kyle) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

#359

(#359) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12381125.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Krinsky, David) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

#358

(#358) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12380642.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Maurer, Aaron) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

#357

(#357) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12380477.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Hardy, Kevin) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

#356

(#356) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12380365.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Genderson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

#355

(#355) NOTICE of Appearance for ASUSTeK Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International by Christopher Scott Geyer (Geyer, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2018) Modified on 5/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/24/2018)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V., Corporate Parent Philips Holdings USA for U.S. Philips Corporation - filed by U.S. Philips Corporation. (klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V. (klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

3 #1

Patent Report Part 2

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s): SEE BOTH PATENT REPORTS. (Attachments: #1 Patent Report Part 2)(klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 6-10

1 #1

Exhibit 1-5

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1839645) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-10, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

494 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#363) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12392537.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/30/2018 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Gerson, Christopher) (Filed on 5/30/2018) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#362) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12382616.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/24/2018 filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Lieber, Natalie) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#361) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12381232.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Suarez, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#360) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12381189.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Thomason, Kyle) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#359) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12381125.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Krinsky, David) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#358) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12380642.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Maurer, Aaron) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#357) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12380477.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Hardy, Kevin) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#356) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12380365.) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Genderson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#355) NOTICE of Appearance for ASUSTeK Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International by Christopher Scott Geyer (Geyer, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2018) Modified on 5/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Re: #353 Notice of Appearance filed by Asustek Computer Inc., ASUS Computer International, #354 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Asustek Com puter Inc., ASUS Computer International. REMINDER TO COUNSEL In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:18-cv-01886-HSG. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
436 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 8, 2016 - filed by ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • SO ORDERED - re (7 in 1:15-cv-01170-GMS, 7 in 1:15-cv-01129-GMS, 6 in 1:15-cv-01125-GMS, 7 in 1:15-cv-01127-GMS, 8 in 1:15-cv-01131-GMS, 8 in 1:15-cv-01130-GMS, 8 in 1:15-cv-01128-GMS, 6 in 1:15-cv-01126-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Sandonato, John D. Carlin, Daniel A. Apgar and Jonathan M. Sharret filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS et al.(mdb) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Sandonato, John D. Carlin, Daniel A. Apgar and Jonathan M. Sharret - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Smyth, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01125-GMS through 1:15-cv-01131-GMS (rjb) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to ASUS Computer International on 12/8/2015; ASUSTeK Computer Inc. on 12/8/2015. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V., Corporate Parent Philips Holdings USA for U.S. Philips Corporation - filed by U.S. Philips Corporation. (klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V. (klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s): SEE BOTH PATENT REPORTS. (Attachments: #1 Patent Report Part 2)(klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against ASUS Computer International, ASUSTeK Computer Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1839645) - filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., U.S. Philips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-10, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(klc) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Asus Computer International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Asustek Computer Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Philips Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant