This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2018 at 07:58:45 (UTC).

KNIGHT v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 KNIGHT filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CATHERINE C. EAGLES and L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00673

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CATHERINE C. EAGLES

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL KNIGHT

Defendant

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANIEL R. FRANCIS

Attorney at CRUMLEY ROBERTS, LLP

2400 Freeman Mill Rd., Ste. 200

Greensboro, NC 27406

TIMOTHY A. SHERIFF

Attorney at CRUMLEY ROBERTS, LLP

1051 E. Morehead St., Ste. 100

Charlotte, NC 28204

Defendant Attorneys

RYAN M. ARNOLD

Attorney at GALLIVAN WHITE & BOYD, P.A.

One Morrocroft Centre, 6805 Morrison Blvd., Ste. 200

Charlotte, NC 28211

CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY

Attorney at GALLIVAN WHITE & BOYD, P.A.

One Morrocroft Centre, 6805 Morrison Blvd., Ste. 200

Charlotte, NC 28211

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER Appointing GARY S. HEMRIC as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#11

(#11) Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RYAN M. ARNOLD on behalf of Defendant NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (ARNOLD, RYAN) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 10/29/2018 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

8 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(FRANCIS, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#6

(#6) STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

5 #1

Consent Form

#5

(#5) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TIMOTHY A. SHERIFF on behalf of Plaintiff DANIEL KNIGHT (SHERIFF, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DANIEL R. FRANCIS on behalf of Plaintiff DANIEL KNIGHT (FRANCIS, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Appointing GARY S. HEMRIC as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Mediation due by 7/25/2019. (Gammon, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. (Gammon, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery shall be placed on a case management track designated in LR 26.1 as exceptional. Discovery due by 8/15/2019. Parties agree to Gary Hemric as mediator. Mediation due by 7/25/2018. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2018. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2018. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 11/30/2018. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 12/31/2018. The parties have not agreed to refer the case to a magistrate judge or to appoint a master. The trial of this action is expected to take approximately 5-7 days.A jury trial has been demanded. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER adopting #11 Joint Certification and Report of Rule 26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan with the following clarification: the deadline for Plaintiff to seek leave to amend pleadings or to add parties is 11/30/2018. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/18/2018. (AULD, L.) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions Referred: RE: #11 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RYAN M. ARNOLD on behalf of Defendant NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (ARNOLD, RYAN) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 10/29/2018 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(FRANCIS, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. Set flag for Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TIMOTHY A. SHERIFF on behalf of Plaintiff DANIEL KNIGHT (SHERIFF, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DANIEL R. FRANCIS on behalf of Plaintiff DANIEL KNIGHT (FRANCIS, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2399315.), filed by DANIEL KNIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FRANCIS, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less