This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 15:53:51 (UTC).

Knight et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 Knight filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby, Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Greg Gerard Guidry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-09421

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judges

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

Greg Gerard Guidry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer E. Knight

Defendants, Intervenor Defendants and Cross Defendants

Viking Pump, Inc.

Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.

Standard Motor Products, Inc.

Nordstrom Valves, Inc.

Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Travelers Indemnity Company

Advance Auto Parts, Inc.

Underwriters At Lloyds London

Fairbanks Morse Pump Corporation

Trane US, Inc.

Champion International Corporation

Dow Chemical Company

BASF Catalysts, LLC

AutoZone, Inc.

Gould Pumps (IPG), Inc.

Edward Valves, Inc.

Flowserve Corporation

Arconic, Inc.

Defendant, Interpleader and Cross Defendant

Dow Chemical Company

153 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Helen Meredith Buckley

Attorney at Salley Hite Mercer & Resor

365 Canal Street, Ste 1710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Bradley Adam Hays

Attorney at MGM The Law Firm (New Orleans)

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kristopher T. Wilson

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard (New Orleans)

60L Poydras St., Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Cross Defendant Attorney

Adam D Whitworth

Attorney at Leake & Andersson, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Other Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Derek Robert Cusick

Attorney at Tindell Symmes Estes & Cusick, PLLC

2200 25Th Avenue

Gulfport, MS 39501

Lauren B. Dietzen

Attorney at Plauche, Maselli, Parkerson, LLP

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70139

Dwight C. Paulsen, III

Attorney at Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Martin James Dempsey, Jr.

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC (New Orleans)

650 Poydras St., Suite 2215

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alex Tyler Robertson

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael H. Abraham

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4350

New Orleans, LA 70139

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Douglas Watson Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux

Attorney at Manning Gross Massenburg

365 Canal Street, Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

David R. Frohn

Attorney at MGM Law Firm

2201 Lake Street, Suite 106

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Erin Helen Boyd

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

147 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

367 #3

Proposed Pleading

367 #2

Memorandum in Support

367 #1

Proposed Order

#367

#366

#365

360 #1

Proposed Order

#360

#359

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

600 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#367) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answers and Affirmative Defenses by Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Pleading)(deMahy, Adam) Modified text on 3/31/2020 (mm). (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#366) ORDER granting #360 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Gould Electronics Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/27/2020. (ko) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#365) ORDER granting #359 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Gould Electronics, Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/27/2020. (ko) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#364) ORDER granting #357 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/27/2020. (ko) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#363) ORDER granting #356 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/27/2020. (ko) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#362) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #361 Notice (Other). **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (mm) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#361) **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** NOTICE by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC Notice of Service of Expert Witness Disclosures. (Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 3/26/2020 (mm). (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#360) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Dismissal of Gould Electronics, Inc. Without Prejudice by Gould Electronics, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cusick, Derek) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (mm). (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#359) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Dismissal of Gould Electronics, Inc. Without Prejudice by Gould Electronics, Inc., Albert L Bossier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cusick, Derek) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (mm). (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#358) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #357 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., #356 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.. **Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
348 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal to Petition for Intervention by Flowserve US Inc.Attorney Stacey Leigh Strain added to party Flowserve US Inc(pty:dft).(Strain, Stacey) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (jeg). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Intervention for Failure to State a Claim by Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Notice of Submission)Attorney Lauren Ann McCulloch added to party Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc.(pty:dft).(McCulloch, Lauren) Modified text on 10/30/2018 (am). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Flowserve US Inc identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc (Strain, Stacey) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/12/2018.(blg) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (sbs) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Albert Bossier, Lamorak Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. By the Clerk.(sbs) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Melancon, David) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2017-3008 "J-5" (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7165239) filed by Albert Bossier, Lamorak Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit) Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert Bossier.(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (sbs). (Attachments 1, 6-13 replaced on 10/11/2018) (sbs). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDWARD VALVE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Advance Auto Parts Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where FAIRBANKS MORSE PUMP CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY is a litigant