This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2019 at 07:30:08 (UTC).

Knight et al v. Golden Cakes Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Knight filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Golden Cakes Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Webber Wright and Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00921

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan Webber Wright

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Demetrius Knight

Tammy Boggs

Mishan Mullins

Defendants

Martin Gunaca

Golden Cakes Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Wesley Burks

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Daniel D. Ford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory James Northen

Attorney at Cross, Gunter, Witherspoon & Galchus, P.C.

Post Office Box 3178

Little Rock, AR 72203-3178

Melissa McJunkins Duke

Attorney at Cross, Gunter, Witherspoon & Galchus, P.C.

Post Office Box 3178

Little Rock, AR 72203-3178

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/14/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

7 #2

Exhibit

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was attached to the docket in error (duplicate pages) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct Civil Cover Sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory James Northen on behalf of All Defendants (Northen, Gregory) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

7 #3

Exhibit

7 #5

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Duke, Melissa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Related Case by Golden Cakes Inc, Martin Gunaca; Case Number 4:18-cv-311-BSM (Duke, Melissa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa McJunkins Duke on behalf of All Defendants (Duke, Melissa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#8

(#8) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss, and to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by All Defendants. (Duke, Melissa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

7 #4

Exhibit

7 #6

Exhibit

#1

(#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Demetrius Knight, Tammy Boggs, Mishan Mullins against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070010. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet - Correct) (thd). (Entered: 12/12/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Motion for Notice of Related Case. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the Honorable Brian Miller. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/09/19. (dmm) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Related Case by Golden Cakes Inc, Martin Gunaca; Case Number 4:18-cv-311-BSM (Duke, Melissa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss, and to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by All Defendants. (Duke, Melissa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Duke, Melissa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory James Northen on behalf of All Defendants (Northen, Gregory) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa McJunkins Duke on behalf of All Defendants (Duke, Melissa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/14/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was attached to the docket in error (duplicate pages) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct Civil Cover Sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Demetrius Knight, Tammy Boggs, Mishan Mullins against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070010. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet - Correct) (thd). (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.