This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2018 at 07:18:06 (UTC).

Klug et al v. CMH Homes, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Klug filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CMH Homes, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Phil Gilbert and Reona J. Daly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01509

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

Referral Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Kathleen A. Klug

Fred D. Klug

Defendant and Counter Claimant

CMH Homes, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Lucas H. Liefer

Attorney at Cooper & Liefer Law Offices

205 East Market Street

Red Bud, IL 62278

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Christopher P. Leritz

Attorney at Leritz & Plunkert, P.C.

555 Washington Avenue, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Acknowledgment from Washington County Circuit Court. (cjo) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND: Case remanded to Washington County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/18/2018. (jdh) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#17

(#17) Letter to Washington County Circuit Clerk re #16 Order of Remand (lmb) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#14

(#14) JURISDICTIONAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs. Plaintiff's Brief on the Issue of Removal. (Liefer, Lucas) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#13

(#13) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by CMH Homes, Inc.. pursuant to the Court's Order of 8/21/18 - Doc. 8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

1 #1

State Court Complaint Exhibit A

13 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 18-CH-19 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3646736), filed by CMH Homes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit A)(Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Declaratory Judgment filed by CMH Homes, Inc.. (Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Declaratory Judgment by CMH Homes, Inc.. Responses due by 9/27/2018 (Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by CMH Homes, Inc..(Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#9

(#9) Defendant CMH Homes, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CMH Homes, Inc..(Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER, re: jurisdiction. The Court ORDERS CMH Homes to file a supplemental brief on this issue by September 5, 2018. The plaintffs' response, if any, will be due by September 19, 2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/21/2018. (jdh) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#7

(#7) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by CMH Homes, Inc.. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Jury Demand)(Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Jury Demand

#5

(#5) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1509-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdb) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#4

(#4) EXHIBIT by CMH Homes, Inc.. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet. (Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMH Homes, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Clayton Homes, Inc., Corporate Parent CMH Homes, Inc. for CMH Homes, Inc.. (Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Acknowledgment from Washington County Circuit Court. (cjo) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Letter to Washington County Circuit Clerk re #16 Order of Remand (lmb) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND: Case remanded to Washington County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/18/2018. (jdh) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #14 Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by Fred D. Klug and Kathleen A. Klug. The Memorandum does not include the appropriate electronic signature. For future filings, refer to Electronic Filing Rule 8 in the User's Manual Section 2.0 (Retention & Signature Requirements). NO action is necessary as this notice is for informational purposes only. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JURISDICTIONAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs. Plaintiff's Brief on the Issue of Removal. (Liefer, Lucas) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by CMH Homes, Inc.. pursuant to the Court's Order of 8/21/18 - Doc. 8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Declaratory Judgment filed by CMH Homes, Inc.. (Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Declaratory Judgment by CMH Homes, Inc.. Responses due by 9/27/2018 (Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by CMH Homes, Inc..(Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant CMH Homes, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CMH Homes, Inc..(Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER, re: jurisdiction. The Court ORDERS CMH Homes to file a supplemental brief on this issue by September 5, 2018. The plaintffs' response, if any, will be due by September 19, 2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/21/2018. (jdh) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by CMH Homes, Inc.. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Jury Demand)(Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • (#6) ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Courts civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 8/31/2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/17/2018. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1509-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdb) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXHIBIT by CMH Homes, Inc.. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet. (Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMH Homes, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Clayton Homes, Inc., Corporate Parent CMH Homes, Inc. for CMH Homes, Inc.. (Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Leritz on behalf of CMH Homes, Inc. (Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 18-CH-19 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3646736), filed by CMH Homes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit A)(Leritz, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.