This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2020 at 16:05:33 (UTC).

Kline et al v. Bitconnect et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 Kline filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Bitconnect. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dave Lee Brannon and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:18-CV-80512

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dave Lee Brannon

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dusty Showers

Andrew Kline

Lena Huna

Charles Mabra

Defendants

BitConnect Trading Ltd.

BitConnect International PLC

Joshua Jeppesen

Ryan Maasen

Bitconnect

BitConnect Ltd.

John Does

Glenn Arcaro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Harris Eggnatz

Attorney at Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.

5400 S. University Drive, Suite 417

Davie, FL 33328

Michael J. Klein

Attorney at Stull Stull & Brody

6 E 45Th St Ste 500

New York, NY 10017

Michael James Pascucci

Attorney at Eggnatz, Lopatin & Pascucci, LLP

5400 South University Drive, 413

Davie, FL 33328

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan K. Stumphauzer

Attorney at Stumphauzer & Sloman, PLLC

One Se Third Ave., Suite 1820

Miami, FL 33131

Kiran Narayan Bhat

Attorney at Stumphauzer & Sloman, PLLC

One Se Third Ave., Suite 1820

Miami, FL 33131

Carl E. Volz

Attorney at K & L Gates, LLP

70 W Madison Street, Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Carol Celeiro Lumpkin

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900

Miami, FL 33131-2399

Desiree Moore

Attorney at K & L Gates, LLP

70 W Madison St Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Nicole Claire Mueller

Attorney at K & L Gates, LLP

70 W Madison Street, Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#46

#41

40 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#40

#39

38 #3

Exhibit 3: Kline Proof of Service

#38

30 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#30

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per Chambers. Closing Case. (kpe) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER Approving Stipulation/Consolidating Cases for Appointing Lead Plaintiff, Approving Co-Lead Counsel and Creation of Executive Committee. The Securities class actions, 9:18-cv-80086-DMM; 9:18-cv-80319DMM; 98:18-cv-21118-DMMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM pending in this Judicial District are hereby consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42 (a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Case numbers 9:18-cv-80319DMM; 98:18-cv-21118-DMMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM are closed. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/19/2018. Associated Cases: 9:18-cv-80086-DMM, 1:18-cv-21118-DMM, 9:18-cv-80319-DMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM (kpe) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCases associated. (kpe) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kiran Narayan Bhat on behalf of Ryan Maasen. Attorney Kiran Narayan Bhat added to party Ryan Maasen(pty:dft). (Bhat, Kiran) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) STIPULATION regarding Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Dkt. No. 30) by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by the BitConnect Investor Group a/k/a filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Silver, David) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by the BitConnect Investor Group a/k/a filed by Andrew Kline. Replies due by 5/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit 2: Paige Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit 3: Kline Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit 4: Mengesha Proof of Service)(Eggnatz, Joshua) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by the BitConnect Investor Group a/k/a filed by Ryan Maasen. Replies due by 5/4/2018. (Stumphauzer, Ryan) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Carl E. Volz, Desiree Moore and Nicole Claire Mueller, mailing date April 18, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Michael J. Klein, mailing date April 18, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ryan Maasen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Paige Lawsuit Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wildes Lawsuit Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Avalos Lawsuit Complaint)(Stumphauzer, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. (Entered: 03/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 2/9/2018. (SRC) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 07/15/08. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Joshua Jeppesen. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Bitconnect LTD. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Ryan Maasen. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Glenn Arcaro. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Bitconnect Trading LTD. (LNR) (LNR). (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS issued as to Bitconnect International, PLC. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA48661) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bitconnect International, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael James Pascucci