This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2019 at 16:17:05 (UTC).

Kline et al v. Bitconnect et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2018 Kline filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Bitconnect. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Pizzo and Elizabeth A. Kovachevich. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-00319

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark A. Pizzo

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Kovachevich

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dusty Showers

Andrew Kline

Lena Huna

Charles Mabra

Defendants

John Does

Joshua Jeppesen

Ryan Maasen

Bitconnect International, PLC

Bitconnect LTD

Glenn Arcaro

Bitconnect

Bitconnect Trading LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua H. Eggnatz

Attorney at The Eggnatz Law Firm, PA

5400 S University Dr Ste 413

Davie, FL 33328-5313

Michael J. Klein

Attorney at Stull Stull & Brody

6 E 45Th St Ste 500

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Stumphauzer

Attorney at Stumphauzer & Sloman PL

One Se 3Rd Avenue, Suite 1820

Miami, FL 33131

Carl E. Volz

Attorney at K & L Gates, LLP

70 W Madison St Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602-4207

Carol Celeiro Lumpkin

Attorney at K & L Gates, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3900

Miami, FL 33131-2370

Desiree Moore

Attorney at K & L Gates, LLP

70 W Madison St Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602-4207

Nicole Claire Mueller

Attorney at K & L Gates, LLP

70 W Madison St Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602-4207

 

Court Documents

#32

31 #5

Exhibit 5

31 #3

Exhibit 3

31 #2

Exhibit 2

31 #1

Exhibit 1

#31

30 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#30

#27

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketCase transferred from Florida Middle has been opened in Southern District of Florida as case 9:18-cv-80512, filed 04/18/2018. (JNB) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketCASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA, WEST PALM BEACH DIVISION. (JNB) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER transferring case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida, West Palm Beach Division. The Court's April 6, 2018 Show Cause Order #27 is DISCHARGED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/17/2018. (RLH) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) AFFIDAVIT of David C. Silver re: #30 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by the BitConnect Investor Group a/k/a by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Silver, David) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by the BitConnect Investor Group a/k/a by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #27 Order pdf filed by Andrew Kline. (Pascucci, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #26 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Local Rule 4.04(b), based on #27 the Court's Order. On its own motion, the Court stays Plaintiffs' deadline to move for class certification pending the Court's ruling on its jurisdiction over this matter. Should the Court retain jurisdiction, Plaintiffs may refile their motion, which the Court will consider as timely filed. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/6/2018. (RLH) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER that on or before Monday, April 16, 2018, Plaintiffs are directed to SHOW CAUSE why this action should be allowed to proceed in this forum. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/6/2018. (RLH) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically From Local Rule 4.04(b) by Lena Huna, Andrew Kline, Charles Mabra, Dusty Showers. (Eggnatz, Joshua) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of compliance re #22 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Glenn Arcaro (Volz, Carl) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ryan Maasen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Paige Lawsuit Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wildes Lawsuit Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Avalos Lawsuit Complaint)(Stumphauzer, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. (Entered: 03/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 2/9/2018. (SRC) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 07/15/08. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Joshua Jeppesen. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Bitconnect LTD. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Ryan Maasen. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Glenn Arcaro. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Bitconnect Trading LTD. (LNR) (LNR). (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS issued as to Bitconnect International, PLC. (LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA48661) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bitconnect International, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bitconnect Trading LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Jason Klein