This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Kirk v. Peters et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 Kirk filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Peters. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William C Griesbach and David E Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01578

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

Referral Judge

David E Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelvin Kirk

Green Bay, WI 54307-9033

Defendants

Sgt Perkins

Peters

Lutsey

RN Larsen

Rachel Larson

Jean Lutsey

Susan Peters

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions

Brandon T Flugaur

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W Main St, Po Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Proposed Summons

#14

(#14) REQUEST MOTION for Delivery of Summons and Complaint on Susan Peters by Kelvin Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Summons)(mac) Modified on 11/30/2018 (amb). Docket report sent to plaintiff via US Mail to show #13 transmit of complaint, notice, wiaver, and order to US Marshals.

#13

(#13) TRANSMIT Complaint, Notice, Waiver, Order and Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form to US Marshals for service upon Deft Peters. (kah).

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to RN Larsen, Lutsey (Flugaur, Brandon)

10 #1

Certificate of Service

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon T Flugaur on behalf of RN Larsen, Lutsey. Attorney(s) appearing: Brandon T. Flugaur (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Flugaur, Brandon)

9 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#8

(#8) SCREENING ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/30/2018 REFERRING this case to Magistrate Judge David E Jones for all Pretrial Proceedings including Report and Recommendation. The Court Denies #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Grants #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Defendant Sgt Perkins is DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Kirk and Warden at GBCI)(Griesbach, William)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER that within 21 days plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $2.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/10/2018. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Kirk and Warden at GBCI)(Griesbach, William)

#5

(#5) LETTER from the clerk to Kelvin Kirk re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (mac)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kelvin Kirk. (mac)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kelvin Kirk. (mac)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REQUEST MOTION for Delivery of Summons and Complaint on Susan Peters by Kelvin Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Summons)(mac) Modified on 11/30/2018 (amb). Docket report sent to plaintiff via US Mail to show #13 transmit of complaint, notice, wiaver, and order to US Marshals.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TRANSMIT Complaint, Notice, Waiver, Order and Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form to US Marshals for service upon Deft Peters. (kah).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by RN Larsen, Lutsey. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Flugaur, Brandon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to RN Larsen, Lutsey (Flugaur, Brandon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon T Flugaur on behalf of RN Larsen, Lutsey. Attorney(s) appearing: Brandon T. Flugaur (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Flugaur, Brandon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) LETTER from the Clerk to Kelvin Kirk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCREENING ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/30/2018 REFERRING this case to Magistrate Judge David E Jones for all Pretrial Proceedings including Report and Recommendation. The Court Denies #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Grants #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Defendant Sgt Perkins is DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Kirk and Warden at GBCI)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $2.00, receipt number GB4689-5311. The payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kelvin Kirk. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that within 21 days plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $2.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/10/2018. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Kirk and Warden at GBCI)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER from the clerk to Kelvin Kirk re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kelvin Kirk. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kelvin Kirk. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kelvin Kirk. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Kelvin Kirk. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.