Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2019 at 08:09:33 (UTC).

Kinnard et al v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 Kinnard filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Charles S. Miller, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00243

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Charles S. Miller, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elaine C. Kinnard

Stephanie L. Fay

Defendant

Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles M. Carvell

Attorney at Pearce & Durick

314 E Thayer Ave, Po Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Jonathan Forster

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP (Bismarck)

100 West Broadway, Suite 250, P.O. Box 2798

Bismarck, ND 58502-2798

Zachary R. Eiken

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

100 W. Broadway, Ste. 250, P.O. Box 2798

Bismarck, ND 58502

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER re Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 12/5/2019. Discovery Motions due by 12/5/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/5/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/21/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 11/11/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/5/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/18/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 1/6/2020. Threshold Motions due by 7/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2020.(GD) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/7/2019 to correct caption) (am). Regenerated on 1/7/2019 (am). (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER:Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hess Corporation for Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC.. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit 12 - Certificate of Service

1 #11

Exhibit 11 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - Certificate of Service

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - Williams Co. Notice of Appearance (Forster & Eiken)

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Notification of Assignment and Case Number

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Return Receipt for Service

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Service

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Memorandum of Oil & Gas Lease

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Oil & Gas Lease

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Williams Co. Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Williams Co. Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC from Williams Co. District Court, case number 53-2018-cv-1757. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000231. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Williams Co. Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Williams Co. Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Oil & Gas Lease, #4 Exhibit 4 - Memorandum of Oil & Gas Lease, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to Fay and Kinnard, #6 Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Service, #7 Exhibit 7 - Return Receipt for Service, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notification of Assignment and Case Number, #9 Exhibit 9 - Williams Co. Notice of Appearance (Forster & Eiken), #10 Exhibit 10 - Certificate of Service, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Certificate of Service, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER re Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • (#7) (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 1/7/2019. (GD) Modified on 1/8/2019 to note that minutes are text only. NEF regenerated (lf). (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. Jury Trial (2 days) set for 6/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (GD) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 12/5/2019. Discovery Motions due by 12/5/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/5/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/21/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 11/11/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/5/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/18/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 1/6/2020. Threshold Motions due by 7/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2020.(GD) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/7/2019 to correct caption) (am). Regenerated on 1/7/2019 (am). (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER:Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hess Corporation for Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC.. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC from Williams Co. District Court, case number 53-2018-cv-1757. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000231. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Williams Co. Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Williams Co. Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Oil & Gas Lease, #4 Exhibit 4 - Memorandum of Oil & Gas Lease, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to Fay and Kinnard, #6 Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Service, #7 Exhibit 7 - Return Receipt for Service, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notification of Assignment and Case Number, #9 Exhibit 9 - Williams Co. Notice of Appearance (Forster & Eiken), #10 Exhibit 10 - Certificate of Service, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Certificate of Service, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Jonathan Forster