This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2019 at 07:30:36 (UTC).

King v. Kelley

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 King filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Kelley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are D. P. Marshall Jr. and J. Thomas Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00307

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

Referral Judge

J. Thomas Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elgin G King

Marianna, AR 72360

Defendant

Wendy Kelley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jason M. Johnson

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

 

Court Documents

8 #2

Exhibit 1A - Argument Portions of Appellants Brief on Direct Appeal, CR-98-1452

8 #12

Exhibit 10 - Order Denying Petitioners Second or Successive Petition for Writ of

8 #9

Exhibit 7 - Order Denying Petitioners Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed

8 #10

Exhibit 8 - Second or Successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed Augus

8 #7

Exhibit 5 - Arkansas Supreme Court Opinion, Delivered February 14, 2002

8 #8

Exhibit 6 - Petitioners Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

8 #5

Exhibit 3 - Petitioners Rule 37 Post Conviction Petition

#9

(#9) ORDER directing King to file, on or before 2/18/2019, a Reply addressing #8 Respondent's arguments for dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/18/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

8 #3

Exhibit 1B - Argument Portions of Appellees Brief on Direct Appeal, CR-98-1452

8 #4

Exhibit 2 - Arkansas Supreme Court Opinion, Delivered September 23, 1999

8 #15

Exhibit 12B - One Volume Direct Appeal Record, CR-98-1452

8 #16

Exhibit 12C - Respondents Exhibit 12B:One Volume Direct Appeal Record, CR-98-145

8 #13

Exhibit 11 - Arkansas Supreme Court Opinion, Delivered March 28, 2013

8 #14

Exhibit 12A - One Volume Direct Appeal Record, CR-98-1452

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1A - Argument Portions of Appellants Brief on Direct Appeal, CR-98-1452, #3 Exhibit 1B - Argument Portions of Appellees Brief on Direct Appeal, CR-98-1452, #4 Exhibit 2 - Arkansas Supreme Court Opinion, Delivered September 23, 1999, #5 Exhibit 3 - Petitioners Rule 37 Post Conviction Petition, #6 Exhibit 4 - Order Denying Rule 37 Petition, #7 Exhibit 5 - Arkansas Supreme Court Opinion, Delivered February 14, 2002, #8 Exhibit 6 - Petitioners Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #9 Exhibit 7 - Order Denying Petitioners Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed July 30, 2009, #10 Exhibit 8 - Second or Successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed August 31, 2011, #11 Exhibit 9 - Second or Successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed February 10, 2012, #12 Exhibit 10 - Order Denying Petitioners Second or Successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed September 4, 2012, #13 Exhibit 11 - Arkansas Supreme Court Opinion, Delivered March 28, 2013, #14 Exhibit 12A - One Volume Direct Appeal Record, CR-98-1452, #15 Exhibit 12B - One Volume Direct Appeal Record, CR-98-1452, #16 Exhibit 12C - Respondents Exhibit 12B:One Volume Direct Appeal Record, CR-98-1452)(Johnson, Jason) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit Index of Exhibits

8 #11

Exhibit 9 - Second or Successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed Febru

8 #6

Exhibit 4 - Order Denying Rule 37 Petition

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER directing King to file, on or before 2/18/2019, a Reply addressing #8 Respondent's arguments for dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/18/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1A - Argument Portions of Appellants Brief on Direct Appeal, CR-98-1452, #3 Exhibit 1B - Argument Portions of Appellees Brief on Direct Appeal, CR-98-1452, #4 Exhibit 2 - Arkansas Supreme Court Opinion, Delivered September 23, 1999, #5 Exhibit 3 - Petitioners Rule 37 Post Conviction Petition, #6 Exhibit 4 - Order Denying Rule 37 Petition, #7 Exhibit 5 - Arkansas Supreme Court Opinion, Delivered February 14, 2002, #8 Exhibit 6 - Petitioners Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #9 Exhibit 7 - Order Denying Petitioners Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed July 30, 2009, #10 Exhibit 8 - Second or Successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed August 31, 2011, #11 Exhibit 9 - Second or Successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed February 10, 2012, #12 Exhibit 10 - Order Denying Petitioners Second or Successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed September 4, 2012, #13 Exhibit 11 - Arkansas Supreme Court Opinion, Delivered March 28, 2013, #14 Exhibit 12A - One Volume Direct Appeal Record, CR-98-1452, #15 Exhibit 12B - One Volume Direct Appeal Record, CR-98-1452, #16 Exhibit 12C - Respondents Exhibit 12B:One Volume Direct Appeal Record, CR-98-1452)(Johnson, Jason) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Respondent's First Motion for Extension of Time. The Response is due 2/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/20/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (tjb) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley (Johnson, Jason) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Johnson on behalf of Wendy Kelley (Johnson, Jason) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #1 King's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing the Clerk to serve a copy of #2 2254 Petition, and this Order, on Respondent and the Attorney General by mail; and directing the Respondent to file a responsive pleading within 21 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/11/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Elgin G King.(kdr) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elgin G King. (kdr) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.