This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:23:51 (UTC).

KING et al v. WAL-MART STORES INC

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 KING filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and GEORGE Z. SINGAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00398

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

GEORGE Z. SINGAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES KING

MAUREEN KING

Defendants

WAL-MART STORES INC

WAL-MART STORES INC doing business as WAL-MART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER A. HARMON

Attorney at TERRY GARMEY & ASSOCIATES

482 Congress Street, Suite 402

Portland, ME 04101

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY

Attorney at MARDEN, DUBORD, BERNIER & STEVENS

44 Elm Street, P.O. Box 708

Waterville, ME 04903

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/4/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/11/2019. Motions due by 3/25/2019. Ready for Trial on 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

7 #5

Exhibit E-Sup Court Removal

7 #4

Exhibit D-Answer

7 #3

Exhibit C-Return of Service

7 #2

Exhibit B-Complaint

7 #1

Exhibit A-Docket Record

#7

(#7) STATE COURT RECORD WITH AFFIDAVIT of Daniel R. Mawhinney filed by WAL-MART STORES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Docket Record, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Return of Service, #4 Exhibit D-Answer, #5 Exhibit E-Sup Court Removal)(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 10/11/2018 to clean up docket text (lrc). (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#5

(#5) Motion to Extend Time to Submit State Court Docket and Duplicate Record by WAL-MART STORES INC Responses due by 10/26/2018. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 10/5/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#3

(#3) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/5/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: J. Driscoll. (jgd) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jgd) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

1 #3

Answer

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Summons Return

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Summons Return, Complaint, and Answer from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number PORSC-CV-18-0395. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WAL-MART STORES INC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/27/2018) Fee due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return, #2 Complaint, #3 Answer)(jgd) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/4/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/11/2019. Motions due by 3/25/2019. Ready for Trial on 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STATE COURT RECORD WITH AFFIDAVIT of Daniel R. Mawhinney filed by WAL-MART STORES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Docket Record, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Return of Service, #4 Exhibit D-Answer, #5 Exhibit E-Sup Court Removal)(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 10/11/2018 to clean up docket text (lrc). (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Reset Deadlines per Order No. 6: State Court Record due by 10/12/2018. (lrc) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to Submit State Court Docket and Duplicate Record. Time is extended to October 12, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion to Extend Time to Submit State Court Docket and Duplicate Record by WAL-MART STORES INC Responses due by 10/26/2018. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 10/5/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1907027.), filed by WAL-MART STORES INC.(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/5/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: J. Driscoll. (jgd) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/5/2018 from WAL-MART STORES INC. (jgd) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jgd) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Summons Return, Complaint, and Answer from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number PORSC-CV-18-0395. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WAL-MART STORES INC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/27/2018) Fee due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return, #2 Complaint, #3 Answer)(jgd) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less