This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2018 at 07:48:35 (UTC).

Kindt v. Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Kindt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Grasscor Lawn Landscapes, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William O. Bertelsman and Candace J. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00177

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William O. Bertelsman

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Kindt

Defendants

Christopher Wells

Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Poole

Attorney at Robert L. Poole & Associates

2656 Crescent Springs Rd, Suite 1

Crescent Springs, KY 41017

Defendant Attorneys

James Milby Ridings

Attorney at Hamm, Milby & Ridings

120 N Main

London, KY 40741

Marcia Milby Ridings

Attorney at Hamm, Milby & Ridings

120 N Main

London, KY 40741

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT to Secretary of State as to Defendant Christopher Wells re Clerk's Note. re #14 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by William Kindt (ECO) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#20

(#20) CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT to Secretary of State as to Defendant Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC re Clerk's Note. re #14 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by William Kindt, (ECO) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC, Christopher Wells Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridings, Marcia) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#18) MOTION to Continue by Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC, Christopher Wells Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridings, Marcia) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#17

(#17) ORDER: That said DOCKET CALL be, and hereby is, set for WEDNESDAY, DECEMBER 12, 2018 at 01:00 PM, to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom before Judge William O. Bertelsman. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 11/9/2018.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 11/09/2018)

14 #1

Secretart of State Envelope

#14

(#14) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Secretary of State as to Christopher Wells. Fee not included with Packet). (Attachments: #1 Secretary of State Envelope)(ECO) Modified typo on 11/5/2018 (ECO). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#7

(#7) CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT to Secretary of State re #4 Summons Issued as to Defendant Christopher Wells. (ECO) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#6

(#15) AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC, Christopher Wells. (Ridings, Marcia) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#5

***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #6 Amended Complaint, re: #5 Order (ECO) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#4

(#8) CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT to Secretary of State re #4 Summons Issued as to Defendant Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC. (ECO) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#3

(#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #3

Summons Defenant Christopher Wells

1 #2

Summons Defendant Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4184524), filed by William Kindt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC, #3 Summons Defenant Christopher Wells)(ECO) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT to Secretary of State as to Defendant Christopher Wells re Clerk's Note. re #14 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by William Kindt (ECO) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT to Secretary of State as to Defendant Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC re Clerk's Note. re #14 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by William Kindt, (ECO) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC, Christopher Wells Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridings, Marcia) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Continue by Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC, Christopher Wells Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridings, Marcia) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER: That said DOCKET CALL be, and hereby is, set for WEDNESDAY, DECEMBER 12, 2018 at 01:00 PM, to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom before Judge William O. Bertelsman. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 11/9/2018.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Note: Clerk returned Secretary of State Packets to Counsel for service re: #14 Summons Returned Unexecuted(Fee not included with Packet), #13 Summons Returned Unexecuted (Fee not included with Packet). (ECO) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #16 Supplemental Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 re #12 Order (ECO) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUPPLEMENTAL FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC. (Ridings, Marcia) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC, Christopher Wells. (Ridings, Marcia) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Secretary of State as to Christopher Wells. Fee not included with Packet). (Attachments: #1 Secretary of State Envelope)(ECO) Modified typo on 11/5/2018 (ECO). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC, Christopher Wells.(Ridings, Marcia) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT to Secretary of State re #4 Summons Issued as to Defendant Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC. (ECO) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT to Secretary of State re #4 Summons Issued as to Defendant Christopher Wells. (ECO) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #6 Amended Complaint, re: #5 Order (ECO) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Kindt.(Poole, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER; 1)Plaintiff to file an amended complaint correcting these deficiencies within 14 days (10/23/18). Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/9/2018.(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC, Christopher Wells; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by via Secretary of State with Secretary of State Packets (2 attested copies of complaint and certified mail receipts for each Defendant). (ECO) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4184524), filed by William Kindt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Grasscor Lawn & Landscapes, LLC, #3 Summons Defenant Christopher Wells)(ECO) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.