This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2018 at 07:51:02 (UTC).

Kindle v. Youngwolfe et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2018 Kindle filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Youngwolfe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly E. West and James H. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00209

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kimberly E. West

James H. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Allen Kindle

Defendants

Jenanna Thornton

Lucy Blackbird

Tom Pheasant

Andy Pheasant

Jasper Swake

Mary Youngwolfe

Janet T. Taylor

Ollie Butler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ralph F. Keen, II

Attorney at Keen Law Office

205 W Division

Stilwell, OK 74960

Terrell Monks

Attorney at Oklahoma Estate Attorneys, PLLC

1840 S. Douglas Blvd.

Midwest City, OK 73130

Defendant Attorney

Alex C. Wilson

Attorney at Brennan Smith & Cherbini, PLLC

Po Box 1067

Muskogee, OK 74402

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk,. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/13/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

2 #10

Exhibit 10 - Ltr from Cherokee Nation

2 #9

Exhibit 9 - Notice of Pendency

2 #8

Exhibit 8 - Receipt and Return

2 #7

Exhibit 7 - Certificate of Svc

2 #6

Exhibit 6 - Summons Return

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Publication Notice

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Notice of Pendency

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Adair County District Court, case number CV-18-026 by Janet T. Taylor (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Janet T. Taylor (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk,. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/13/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Adair County District Court, case number CV-18-026 by Janet T. Taylor (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Janet T. Taylor (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Lucy Blackbird, Ollie Butler, Andy Pheasant, Tom Pheasant, Jasper Swake, Janet T. Taylor, Jenanna Thornton, Mary Youngwolfe by Keith Allen Kindle (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less