This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2019 at 07:27:26 (UTC).

Kilroy Was Here, LLC et al v. Starr Indemnity and Liability Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 Kilroy Was Here, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02157

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelly Hendricks Volk

Tulsa, OK 74133

Tammy Hinds

St. Peters, MO 63376

Randall Arthur

St. Louis, MO 63121

Barbara Ann Estivo

Kirkwood, MO 63122

John DeSousa

Kirkwood, MO 63122

Kurt Volk

Tulsa, OK 74133

Kilroy Was Here, LLC

Jeffrey Maxvill

Chesterfield, MO 63005

Shelly Goodman

Waterloo, IL 62298

Janet Martinez

St. Louis, MO 63129

Brenda Arthur

St. Louis, MO 63121

Brenda Randall

Arthur Randall

Barbara Estivo

Defendants

Brian McBrearty

St. Louis, MO 63105

Starr Indemnity and Liability Company

2099 Park Avenue, Third Floor

New York, NY 10022

McBrearty Huck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd I. Muchnick

Attorney at MUCHNICK AND HABER, LC

8151 Clayton Road, Suite 201

St. Louis, MO 63117

Brent L. Martin

Attorney at FARRELL AND MARTIN

220 Salt Lick Road

St. Peters, MO 63376

David M. Zevan

Attorney at Zevan Davidson Roman, LLC

211 N. Broadway, Suite 2675

St. Louis, MO 63102

Gregory L. Shevlin

Attorney at COOK AND SHEVLIN

12 W. Lincoln Street

Belleville, IL 62220-2085

Defendant Attorneys

Albert J. Bronsky

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES, P.C.

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Gerald P. Greiman

Attorney at SPENCER FANE LLP

1 N. Brentwood Boulevard, Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63105

Megan D. Meadows

Attorney at SPENCER FANE LLP

1 N. Brentwood Blvd., Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1822-CC11663, with receipt number 0865-6949084, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Case, #2 Exhibit B, Assignment of Claims Contract, #3 Exhibit C, Docket Sheet from Case #1622-CC01190, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form)(Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C, Docket Sheet from Case #1622-CC01190

1 #1

Exhibit A, State Court Case

1 #2

Exhibit B, Assignment of Claims Contract

1 #6

Original Filing Form

1 #5

Supplement Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company [Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal] Sent To: Plaintiff (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. Parent companies: Starr Global Financial, Inc., Starr Insurance Holdings, Inc., Starr Global Holdings AG, Starr International Company, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#27

(#27) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Motion to Disqualify Certain Counsel for Plaintiffs] Todd A. Muchnick, Aaron D. Haber, Gregory L. Shevlin & Brent L. Martin filed by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Kurt Volk. (Muchnick, Todd) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#24

(#24) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Motion to Disqualify Certain Counsel for Plaintiffs] Todd A. Muchnick, Aaron D. Haber, Gregory L. Shevlin & Brent L. Martin by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#14

(#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Meadows, Megan) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#26

(#26) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill. (Muchnick, Todd) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#25

(#25) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Motion to Disqualify Certain Counsel for Plaintiffs] Todd A. Muchnick, Aaron D. Haber, Gregory L. Shevlin & Brent L. Martin filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#23

(#23) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand] filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Petition filed by Plaintiffs Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall. (Zevan, David) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#17

(#18) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Petition filed by Defendant Brian McBrearty. (Bronsky, Albert) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#6

(#21) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and VI of Petition filed by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Kurt Volk. (Muchnick, Todd) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Motion to Disqualify Certain Counsel for Plaintiffs] Todd A. Muchnick, Aaron D. Haber, Gregory L. Shevlin & Brent L. Martin filed by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Kurt Volk. (Muchnick, Todd) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill. (Muchnick, Todd) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Motion to Disqualify Certain Counsel for Plaintiffs] Todd A. Muchnick, Aaron D. Haber, Gregory L. Shevlin & Brent L. Martin filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Motion to Disqualify Certain Counsel for Plaintiffs] Todd A. Muchnick, Aaron D. Haber, Gregory L. Shevlin & Brent L. Martin by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand] filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Petition filed by Plaintiffs Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall. (Zevan, David) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and VI of Petition filed by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Kurt Volk. (Muchnick, Todd) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Meadows, Megan) filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 2/12/2019.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/24/2019. (JMC) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Meadows, Megan) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Petition filed by Defendant Brian McBrearty. (Bronsky, Albert) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company [St. Louis City Circuit Clerk's Acknowledgement of Notice of Removal] Sent To: State Court - Executed (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Kelly Hendricks Volk, Shelly Goodman, Brenda Randall, John DeSousa, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Barbara Estivo, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Tammy Hinds, Kurt Volk.(BAK) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and VI of Petition filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and VI of Petition by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company.(Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Megan D. Meadows for Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Meadows, Megan) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. Parent companies: Starr Global Financial, Inc., Starr Insurance Holdings, Inc., Starr Global Holdings AG, Starr International Company, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company [Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal] Sent To: Plaintiff (Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1822-CC11663, with receipt number 0865-6949084, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Case, #2 Exhibit B, Assignment of Claims Contract, #3 Exhibit C, Docket Sheet from Case #1622-CC01190, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form)(Greiman, Gerald) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.