This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 18:58:44 (UTC).

Khotovitskaya v. Shimunov et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 Khotovitskaya filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Shimunov. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Nicholas G. Garaufis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07303

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elena Khotovitskaya

Elena Panova

Defendants

David Shimunov

Albert Shimunov

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deon Joshua Nossel

Attorney at Deon Nassel Attorney at Law

253 West 72Nd Street, #507

New York, NY 10023

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elena Khotovitskaya. David Shimunov served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Nossel, Deon) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elena Khotovitskaya. Albert Shimunov served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Nossel, Deon) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

2 #1

Albert summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Albert summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

1 #3

Proposed Summons David Shimunov

1 #2

Proposed Summons Albert Shimunov

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Albert Shimunov, David Shimunov filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11051212 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Elena Khotovitskaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Albert Shimunov, #3 Proposed Summons David Shimunov) (Nossel, Deon) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elena Khotovitskaya. David Shimunov served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Nossel, Deon) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 3/13/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/13/2019. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elena Khotovitskaya. Albert Shimunov served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Nossel, Deon) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Albert summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Albert Shimunov, David Shimunov filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11051212 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Elena Khotovitskaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Albert Shimunov, #3 Proposed Summons David Shimunov) (Nossel, Deon) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less