This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 11:41:15 (UTC).

Khaled et al v. Bordenave et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 Khaled filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Bordenave. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05187

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Khaled M. Khaled

ATK Entertainment, Inc.

Defendants

Business Moves Consulting

Curtis Bordenave

Business Moves Consulting Inc.

Business Moves Consulting Inc. doing business as Business Consulting

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig S. Mende

Attorney at Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.

4 Times Square, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

David Donahue

Attorney at Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.

4 Times Square, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Sean F. Harb

Attorney at Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.

4 Times Square, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew W. Siegal

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Peter T. Shapiro

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Water St)

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Complaint. Granted. Curtis Bordenave answer due 8/14/2018; Business Moves Consulting Inc. answer due 8/14/2018. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/27/2018) (rro) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#15

(#15) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Consent addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Matthew W. Siegal dated July 27, 2018. Document filed by Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting Inc..(Siegal, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS: granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Matthew W. Siegel, Esq., of Dilworth & Barrese, LLP. be substituted as counsel of record for defendants in the above-captioned action, in place of Peter Shapiro, Esq. of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. Attorney Peter T. Shapiro terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/26/2018) (ama) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order

#13

(#13) FIRST MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Peter Shapiro, New Attorney: Matthew W. Siegal on Consent. Document filed by Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Siegal, Matthew) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties hereto that Defendants shall have up to and including July 31, 2018 to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Curtis Bordenave answer due 7/31/2018; Business Moves Consulting Inc. answer due 7/31/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/29/2018) (anc) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

#10

(#10) COMPLAINT against Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting Inc.. Document filed by Khaled M. Khaled, ATK Entertainment, Inc..(Mende, Craig) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

#9

(#9) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (sj) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean F. Harb on behalf of ATK Entertainment, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. (Harb, Sean) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Donahue on behalf of ATK Entertainment, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. (Donahue, David) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Curtis Bordenave and Business Moves Consulting Inc. dba Business Moves, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ATK Entertainment, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. (Mende, Craig) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

#4

(#4) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Mende, Craig) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ATK Entertainment, Inc..(Mende, Craig) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mende, Craig) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Craig S. Mende to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Complaint. Granted. Curtis Bordenave answer due 8/14/2018; Business Moves Consulting Inc. answer due 8/14/2018. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/27/2018) (rro) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Consent addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Matthew W. Siegal dated July 27, 2018. Document filed by Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting Inc..(Siegal, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS: granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Matthew W. Siegel, Esq., of Dilworth & Barrese, LLP. be substituted as counsel of record for defendants in the above-captioned action, in place of Peter Shapiro, Esq. of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. Attorney Peter T. Shapiro terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/26/2018) (ama) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FIRST MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Peter Shapiro, New Attorney: Matthew W. Siegal on Consent. Document filed by Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Siegal, Matthew) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties hereto that Defendants shall have up to and including July 31, 2018 to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Curtis Bordenave answer due 7/31/2018; Business Moves Consulting Inc. answer due 7/31/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/29/2018) (anc) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) COMPLAINT against Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting Inc.. Document filed by Khaled M. Khaled, ATK Entertainment, Inc..(Mende, Craig) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (sj) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Craig S. Mende to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Craig S. Mende. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Business Moves Consulting Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean F. Harb on behalf of ATK Entertainment, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. (Harb, Sean) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Donahue on behalf of ATK Entertainment, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. (Donahue, David) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Curtis Bordenave and Business Moves Consulting Inc. dba Business Moves, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ATK Entertainment, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. (Mende, Craig) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Mende, Craig) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ATK Entertainment, Inc..(Mende, Craig) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mende, Craig) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Khaled M. Khaled, Business Moves Consulting. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15178291)Document filed by Khaled M. Khaled, ATK Entertainment, Inc..(Mende, Craig) Modified on 6/11/2018 (sj). (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Business Moves Consulting is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter T. Shapiro Esq.