This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2018 at 09:17:38 (UTC).

Key v. Butch's Rat Hole & Anchor Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/28/2017 Key filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Butch's Rat Hole Anchor Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin R. Sweazea and Robert C. Brack. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-01171

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Brack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Key

Defendant

Butch's Rat Hole & Anchor Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Derek Braziel

Travis Andrew Gasper

Jack L. Siegel

Defendant Attorneys

Charlotte A. Lamont

Yvette V. Gatling

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 2/22/2018 at 10:30 AM in Las Cruces. Joint Status Report due by 2/6/2018. (cbf)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 2/22/2018 at 10:30 AM in Las Cruces. Joint Status Report due by 2/6/2018. (cbf)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butch's Rat Hole & Anchor Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack L. Siegel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis Andrew Gasper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Derek Braziel