This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2019 at 07:51:35 (UTC).

KERNICK v. N.A.R. INC.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 KERNICK filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against N A R INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01505

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICK KERNICK

Defendant

N.A.R. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clayton S. Morrow

Attorney at Morrow & Artim, PC

304 Ross Street, 7Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Richard J. Perr

Attorney at Fineman Krekstein & Harris, P.C.

Ten Penn Center, 1801 Market Street, Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Monica M. Littman

Attorney at Fineman Krekstein & Harris, P.C.

1801 Market Street, Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Sur-Reply

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by PATRICK KERNICK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Sur-Reply) (Morrow, Clayton) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#10

(#10) BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by N.A.R. INC.. (Littman, Monica) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by N.A.R. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Littman, Monica) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) BRIEF in Opposition re #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by PATRICK KERNICK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrow, Clayton) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

6 #7

Exhibit 5

6 #6

Exhibit 4

6 #5

Exhibit 3

6 #4

Exhibit 2

6 #3

Exhibit 1

6 #2

Declaration

6 #1

Certification of Counsel

#6

(#6) BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Compel filed by N.A.R. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5) (Littman, Monica) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by N.A.R. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Littman, Monica) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER denying #12 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/12/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by PATRICK KERNICK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Sur-Reply) (Morrow, Clayton) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, as follows. The Court will consider Defendant's arguments in reply, as they are stated in Defendant's Brief in Support (Doc. #10 ). Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/10/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by N.A.R. INC.. (Littman, Monica) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by N.A.R. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Littman, Monica) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BRIEF in Opposition re #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by PATRICK KERNICK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrow, Clayton) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Response re #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Consistent with the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), Plaintiff's response is due by 12/5/18. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, and no briefing schedule will issue. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 11/27/18. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/16/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Compel filed by N.A.R. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5) (Littman, Monica) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by N.A.R. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Littman, Monica) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/13/18. (jhi) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Monica M. Littman on behalf of N.A.R. INC.. (Littman, Monica) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by N.A.R. INC.. (Perr, Richard) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 11/16/2018. (ept) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number AR 18-3477 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4927873), filed by N.A.R. INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less