This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/28/2018 at 07:32:10 (UTC).

Kenney v. Department of Corrections, et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 Kenney filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Yarbrough and Martha Vazquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00728

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

Presiding Judge

Martha Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Kenney

Los Lunas, NM 87031-1328

Defendants

Betty Judd

Dyanne Leyba

Department of Corrections

Taylor Aragon

Erica Valles

Lita Bailly

Centurion

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Deborah D. Wells

Attorney at Kennedy, Moulton & Wells PC

2201 San Pedro Ne, Building 3, Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Daniel P Struck

Attorney at Struck Love Bojanowski & Acedo, PLC

3100 West Ray Road, Suite 300

Chandler, AZ 85226

Jacob B Lee

Attorney at Struck Love Bojanowski & Acedo, PLC

3100 West Ray Road, Suite 300

Chandler, AZ 85226

Debra J. Moulton

Attorney at Kennedy, Moulton & Wells PC

2201 San Pedro Ne, Building 3, Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Lawrence M Marcus

Attorney at Park & Associates, LLC

3840 Mashead St. N.E.

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Alfred A Park

Attorney at Park & Associates, LLC

3840 Masthead St., N.E.

Albuquerque, NM 87109

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of Removal

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Kevin Kenney. (gr) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUPPORTIVE AFFIDAVITS by Kevin Kenney. (gr) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT by Kevin Kenney. (gr) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) For Damages by Lita Bailly, Centurion, Dyanne Leyba. (Marcus, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence M Marcus on behalf of Lita Bailly, Centurion, Dyanne Leyba (Marcus, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred A Park on behalf of Lita Bailly, Centurion, Dyanne Leyba (Park, Alfred) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Taylor Aragon, Betty Judd, Erica Valles. (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Stay and Screen Complaint by Taylor Aragon, Lita Bailly, Betty Judd. (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5945444 re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Warden Betty Judd, Officer Erica Valles, CoreCivic, Officer Taylor Aragon (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CoreCivic, Officer Erica Valles, Warden Betty Judd, Officer Taylor Aragon from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, County of Cibola, case number D-1333-CV-201800178. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by CoreCivic, Officer Erica Valles, Warden Betty Judd, Officer Taylor Aragon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS REHAB. K.V.S.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debra J. Moulton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deborah D. Wells