This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2018 at 03:48:02 (UTC).

KENDRICK v. STATE OF GEORGIA et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 KENDRICK filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against STATE OF GEORGIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE J ABRAMS and THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE J ABRAMS

Referral Judge

THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TONY KENDRICK

Pelham, GA 31779

Defendants

STATE OF GEORGIA

JOHN AND OR JANE DOE

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TONY KENDRICK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(mdm) Modified on 1/11/2018 (mdm). (Entered: 01/11/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by TONY KENDRICK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm) Modified on 1/11/2018 (mdm). (Entered: 01/11/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TONY KENDRICK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(mdm) Modified on 1/11/2018 (mdm). (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by TONY KENDRICK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm) Modified on 1/11/2018 (mdm). (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF added. (bcl) Modified on 1/11/2018 (mdm). (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.