This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2019 at 07:27:35 (UTC).

KELLY v. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 KELLY filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joy Flowers Conti. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01507

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joy Flowers Conti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLENN KELLY

Defendant

CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M. McQuiston

Attorney at Thomson, Rhodes & Cowie

1010 Two Chatham Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

Marjorie Bagnato

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

2 Ppg Place, 4Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/3/18. (mh) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Settlement PETITION FOR COMPROMISED SETTLEMENT OF SEAMAN'S SUIT by GLENN KELLY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McQuiston, David) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. The proposed release between Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. and thePlaintiff and Plaintiffs medical records shall be filed under seal. The parties are not required to fileredacted versions of the documents. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Document Sealed Permanently. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/15/2018. (smc) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Errata re #4 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Proposed Release and Medical Records of Plaintiff-Seaman by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. Reason for Correction: The whole document was not attached. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Proposed Release and Medical Records of Plaintiff-Seaman by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie Bagnato on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. (Bagnato, Marjorie) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4928401) filed by GLENN KELLY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/3/18. (mh) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SEALED DOCUMENT. (mh) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti: Confirmation Hearing held on 12/3/2018. Court approved settlement, as explained on the record. (Court Reporter: Deborah Rowe) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mh) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Settlement PETITION FOR COMPROMISED SETTLEMENT OF SEAMAN'S SUIT by GLENN KELLY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McQuiston, David) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Confirmation Hearing set for 12/3/2018 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti. (mh) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibits A-J to Petition for Comprised Settlement of Seaman's Suit) by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. This document Sealed pursuant to #6 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (ksa) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. The proposed release between Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. and thePlaintiff and Plaintiffs medical records shall be filed under seal. The parties are not required to fileredacted versions of the documents. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Document Sealed Permanently. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/15/2018. (smc) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Errata re #4 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Proposed Release and Medical Records of Plaintiff-Seaman by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. Reason for Correction: The whole document was not attached. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Joint MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Proposed Release and Medical Records of Plaintiff-Seaman by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie Bagnato on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. (Bagnato, Marjorie) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4928401) filed by GLENN KELLY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less