This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2019 at 07:18:59 (UTC).

Kela Tennis Inc. v. Lexington Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 Kela Tennis Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lexington Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent L. Briccetti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-12279

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vincent L. Briccetti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KELA TENNIS

Kela Tennis Inc.

Defendant

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Philip Tureaud

Attorney at Keane & Beane, P.C.

445 Hamilton Avenue, 15Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10601

Defendant Attorney

Thomas D Jacobson

Attorney at Clausen Miller P.C.

28 Liberty Street Fl 39

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 3/15/2019. Non-expert depositions shall be completed by 6/13/2019. Expert Deposition due by 7/28/2019. Fact Discovery due by 6/13/2019. Expert Discovery due by 7/28/2019. Discovery due by 8/13/2019. Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of the trial is two weeks. 16. By 6/13/19, counsel to submit joint letter regarding (i) status of plaintiff's case against Mt. Vernon arising out of the destruction of the tennis bubble, and (ii) status of settlement discussions in this case or in the case against Mt. Vernon. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/13/2019) (mml) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on 2-13-19 at 10:00 a.m., at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, Courtroom 620, White Plains, NY 10601. PLAINTIFF, OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, SHALL NOTIFY ALL PARTIES, IN WRITING, OF THE CONFERENCE DATE AND TIME, AND PROVIDE ALL PARTIES WITH A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE ATTACHED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER (UNLESS THE CASE HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH EVENT COUNSEL FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT(S) SHALL PROVIDE SUCH NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES). Initial Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (ama) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#12

(#12) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kela Tennis Inc..(Tureaud, Andrew) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER: STIPULATION TO DISMISS COUNTS II AND III OF COMPLAINT IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and/or respective counsel that Counts II and III of plaintiffs Complaint are hereby withdrawn and dismissed with prejudice and without costs. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Lexington Insurance Company will file their Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint by January 11, 2019. Clerk shall terminate the letter-motion. (Doc. #9) SO ORDERED. (Lexington Insurance Company answer due 1/11/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 1/4/2019) (jca) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew Philip Tureaud on behalf of Kela Tennis Inc.. New Address: Keane & Beane, P.C., 445 Hamilton Avenue, 15th Floor, White Plains, New York, United States 10601, (914) 946-4777. (Tureaud, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#9

(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Thomas D. Jacobson dated January 4, 2019. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Philip Tureaud on behalf of Kela Tennis Inc.. (Tureaud, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobson, Thomas) Modified on 1/3/2019 (lb). (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #4 Rul3 7.1 Statement) - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobson, Thomas) Modified on 12/28/2018 (db). (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jacobson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas D Jacobson to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, all exhibits to pleading must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 3/15/2019. Non-expert depositions shall be completed by 6/13/2019. Expert Deposition due by 7/28/2019. Fact Discovery due by 6/13/2019. Expert Discovery due by 7/28/2019. Discovery due by 8/13/2019. Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of the trial is two weeks. 16. By 6/13/19, counsel to submit joint letter regarding (i) status of plaintiff's case against Mt. Vernon arising out of the destruction of the tennis bubble, and (ii) status of settlement discussions in this case or in the case against Mt. Vernon. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/13/2019) (mml) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/13/2019. Case management plan signed. Joint letter regarding settlement due on or before 6-13-19. Next conference is scheduled for 9-6-19 at 10:00 a.m. (dh) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on 2-13-19 at 10:00 a.m., at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, Courtroom 620, White Plains, NY 10601. PLAINTIFF, OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, SHALL NOTIFY ALL PARTIES, IN WRITING, OF THE CONFERENCE DATE AND TIME, AND PROVIDE ALL PARTIES WITH A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE ATTACHED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER (UNLESS THE CASE HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH EVENT COUNSEL FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT(S) SHALL PROVIDE SUCH NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES). Initial Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (ama) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kela Tennis Inc..(Tureaud, Andrew) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER: STIPULATION TO DISMISS COUNTS II AND III OF COMPLAINT IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and/or respective counsel that Counts II and III of plaintiffs Complaint are hereby withdrawn and dismissed with prejudice and without costs. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Lexington Insurance Company will file their Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint by January 11, 2019. Clerk shall terminate the letter-motion. (Doc. #9) SO ORDERED. (Lexington Insurance Company answer due 1/11/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 1/4/2019) (jca) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew Philip Tureaud on behalf of Kela Tennis Inc.. New Address: Keane & Beane, P.C., 445 Hamilton Avenue, 15th Floor, White Plains, New York, United States 10601, (914) 946-4777. (Tureaud, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Thomas D. Jacobson dated January 4, 2019. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Philip Tureaud on behalf of Kela Tennis Inc.. (Tureaud, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas D Jacobson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kela Tennis Inc.; Lexington Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas D Jacobson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code Westchester; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas D Jacobson to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, all exhibits to pleading must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobson, Thomas) Modified on 1/3/2019 (lb). (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #4 Rul3 7.1 Statement) - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobson, Thomas) Modified on 12/28/2018 (db). (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jacobson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK, County of WESTCHESTER. Case Number: 68510/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16114657).Document filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(Jacobson, Thomas) Modified on 1/2/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant