This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:41:30 (UTC).

Keith v. Hickman Mills C-1 School District et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Keith filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Hickman Mills C-1 School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is John T. Maughmer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00672

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John T. Maughmer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tamara Keith

Defendants

Roger Williams

Dennis Carpenter

Torrance Allen

Christopher Barker

Carrie Moutray

Hickman Mills C-1 School District

Dawn Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tracey T. Chappell

12714 East 64Th Court

Kansas City, MO 64133

Rebecca Martin-Rivers

59 Bonnet Point Road

Narragansette, RI 02882

Defendant Attorneys

Mark D. Katz

Attorney at Coronado Katz, LLC

14 West 3Rd Street, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64105

Steven F. Coronado

Attorney at Coronado Katz, LLC

14 West 3Rd Street, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64105

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County Missouri County, case number 1616-CV22419, filed by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Hickman Mills C-1 School District. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5907882. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to 8-24-18 Notice of Removal - Jackson County Circuit Case 1616-CV22419, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to 8-24-18 Notice of Removal - Email dated Apr. 25 2018, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Katz, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to 8-24-18 Notice of Removal - Jackson County Circuit Case 161

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B to 8-24-18 Notice of Removal - Email dated Apr. 25 2018

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hickman Mills C-1 School District of Notice to Jackson County, Missouri Circuit Court of Filing of Notice of Removal filed by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Defendant Hickman Mills C-1 School District.(Katz, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#3

(#7) ORDER denying #3 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed on 8/29/18 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Alexander, Pam) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

4 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of appearance by Rebecca Martin-Rivers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Rebecca Martin-Rivers added to party Tamara Keith(pty:pla))(Martin-Rivers, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

35 #1

Magistrate Consent

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Torrance Allen, Christopher Barker, Dennis Carpenter, Hickman Mills C-1 School District, Tamara Keith, Carrie Moutray, Dawn Smith, Roger Williams. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#34

(#34) MOTION to stay filed by Rebecca Martin-Rivers on behalf of Tamara Keith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Martin-Rivers, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#33

(#33) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #25 Supplemental MOTION to dismiss party Hickman Mills C-1 School DistrictSupplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Supplemental Suggestions in Opposition filed by Rebecca Martin-Rivers on behalf of Plaintiff Tamara Keith. Reply suggestions due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Martin-Rivers, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#25

(#33) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #25 Supplemental MOTION to dismiss party Hickman Mills C-1 School DistrictSupplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Supplemental Suggestions in Opposition filed by Rebecca Martin-Rivers on behalf of Plaintiff Tamara Keith. Reply suggestions due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Martin-Rivers, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of appearance by Steven F. Coronado on behalf of Torrance Allen, Christopher Barker, Dennis Carpenter, Carrie Moutray, Dawn Smith, Roger Williams (Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Torrance Allen(pty:dft), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Christopher Barker(pty:dft), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Dennis Carpenter(pty:dft), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Carrie Moutray(pty:dft), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Dawn Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Roger Williams(pty:dft))(Coronado, Steven) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of filing Individual Defendants' Consent to Removal by Torrance Allen, Christopher Barker, Dennis Carpenter, Carrie Moutray, Dawn Smith, Roger Williams (Katz, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#29

(#29) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Torrance Allen, Christopher Barker, Dennis Carpenter, Carrie Moutray, Dawn Smith, Roger Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Katz, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

30 #1

Exhibit A-MHRA Complaint

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Torrance Allen, Christopher Barker, Dennis Carpenter, Hickman Mills C-1 School District, Tamara Keith, Carrie Moutray, Dawn Smith, Roger Williams. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 11/7/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION to stay filed by Rebecca Martin-Rivers on behalf of Tamara Keith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Martin-Rivers, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #25 Supplemental MOTION to dismiss party Hickman Mills C-1 School DistrictSupplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Supplemental Suggestions in Opposition filed by Rebecca Martin-Rivers on behalf of Plaintiff Tamara Keith. Reply suggestions due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Martin-Rivers, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of appearance by Steven F. Coronado on behalf of Torrance Allen, Christopher Barker, Dennis Carpenter, Carrie Moutray, Dawn Smith, Roger Williams (Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Torrance Allen(pty:dft), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Christopher Barker(pty:dft), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Dennis Carpenter(pty:dft), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Carrie Moutray(pty:dft), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Dawn Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Roger Williams(pty:dft))(Coronado, Steven) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE of filing Individual Defendants' Consent to Removal by Torrance Allen, Christopher Barker, Dennis Carpenter, Carrie Moutray, Dawn Smith, Roger Williams (Katz, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) SUGGESTIONS in support re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Defendants Torrance Allen, Christopher Barker, Dennis Carpenter, Carrie Moutray, Dawn Smith, Roger Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-MHRA Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Policy AC)(Related document(s) #29 ) (Katz, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Torrance Allen, Christopher Barker, Dennis Carpenter, Carrie Moutray, Dawn Smith, Roger Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Katz, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE of appearance by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Torrance Allen, Christopher Barker, Dennis Carpenter, Carrie Moutray, Dawn Smith, Roger Williams (Attorney Mark D. Katz added to party Torrance Allen(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Katz added to party Christopher Barker(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Katz added to party Dennis Carpenter(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Katz added to party Carrie Moutray(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Katz added to party Dawn Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Katz added to party Roger Williams(pty:dft))(Katz, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tamara Keith Third Request for Production filed by Rebecca Martin-Rivers on behalf of Plaintiff Tamara Keith.(Martin-Rivers, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Defendant Hickman Mills C-1 School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint of Discrimination)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Katz, Mark) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Hickman Mills C-1 School District. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/14/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Katz, Mark) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying #3 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed on 8/29/18 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Alexander, Pam) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to remand to state court filed by Rebecca Martin-Rivers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/11/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Billing and Attorneys' Fees)(Martin-Rivers, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of appearance by Rebecca Martin-Rivers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Rebecca Martin-Rivers added to party Tamara Keith(pty:pla))(Martin-Rivers, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to the following attorneys: Mart Katz, Steven Coronado, and Tracey Chappell. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 9/14/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for leave to file excess pages for the School District's Suggesions in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complant filed by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Hickman Mills C-1 School District. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/7/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Katz, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hickman Mills C-1 School District of Notice to Jackson County, Missouri Circuit Court of Filing of Notice of Removal filed by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Defendant Hickman Mills C-1 School District.(Katz, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County Missouri County, case number 1616-CV22419, filed by Mark D. Katz on behalf of Hickman Mills C-1 School District. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5907882. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to 8-24-18 Notice of Removal - Jackson County Circuit Case 1616-CV22419, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to 8-24-18 Notice of Removal - Email dated Apr. 25 2018, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Katz, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.