This case was last updated from PACER on 01/28/2019 at 08:11:33 (UTC).

Katchadurian v. Premier Control Systems, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Katchadurian filed an Other lawsuit against Premier Control Systems, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Erin Wilder-Doomes and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01049

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

James Katchadurian

Premier Control Systems, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony C. Marino

Attorney at Schully, Roberts, Slattery, Jaubert & Marino

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1800

New Orleans, LA 70163

Rosalind Goldberg Wolf

Attorney at Slattery, Marino & Roberts

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1800

New Orleans, LA 70163

Kelly Greenwood Prather

Attorney at The Greenwood Prather Law Firm

2009 North Durham Drive

Houston, TX 77008

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Status Report by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Leave to File Ex Parte Status Report, #2 Proposed Pleading; Status Report)(Prather, Kelly) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

14 #2

Proposed Pleading; Status Report

14 #1

Order Granting Leave to File Ex Parte Status Report

#13

(#13) Summons Issued as to Premier Control Systems, L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#12

(#12) Summons Submitted (Prather, Kelly) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/9/2019 to flatten the image) (NLT). (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/24/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2018. (NLT) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

8 #3

Attachment

8 #1

Affidavit

8 #2

Attachment

#8

(#8) MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1872492) by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Wolf, Rosalind) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Oath as to #8 MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Wolf, Rosalind) Modified on 12/13/2018 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

6 #2

Attachment

6 #3

Attachment

6 #4

Proposed Pleading;

6 #1

Affidavit

#6

(#6) MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1868950) by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Wolf, Rosalind) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of civil cover sheet filing by James Katchadurian (Wolf, Rosalind) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#3

(#3) Letter to Attorney Anthony Marino regarding Kelly Greenwood Prather who is Co-Counsel for party James Katchadurian, Litigation Trustee. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/30/2018) (EDC). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Status Report by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Leave to File Ex Parte Status Report, #2 Proposed Pleading; Status Report)(Prather, Kelly) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Summons Issued as to Premier Control Systems, L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Summons Submitted (Prather, Kelly) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/9/2019 to flatten the image) (NLT). (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/24/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2018. (NLT) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Kelly G. Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Oath as to #8 MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Wolf, Rosalind) Modified on 12/13/2018 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1872492). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1872492) by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Wolf, Rosalind) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(8)(C)(D). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/06/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1868950). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1868950) by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Wolf, Rosalind) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • (#5) Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Premier Control Systems, LLC. The summons was submitted by an attorney who is not admitted at Middle District of Louisiana. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (EDC) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of civil cover sheet filing by James Katchadurian (Wolf, Rosalind) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to Attorney Anthony Marino regarding Kelly Greenwood Prather who is Co-Counsel for party James Katchadurian, Litigation Trustee. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/30/2018) (EDC). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Submitted (Wolf, Rosalind) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/29/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/29/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers by James Katchadurian, Litigation Trustee against Premier Control Systems, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1868022.), filed by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Wolf, Rosalind) Modified on 11/29/2018 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.