This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2018 at 07:33:29 (UTC).

Kasper v. Experian Information Solutions Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 Kasper filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michelle H Burns and John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03070

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michelle H Burns

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guy Kasper

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions Incorporated

Trans Union LLC

Discover Financial Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Lee McBride

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group

2633 E Indian School Rd., Ste. 460

Phoenix, AZ 85016

David James McGlothlin

Attorney at Hyde & Swigart

2633 E Indian School Rd., Ste. 460

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Emily Gildar Wagner

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Jennifer Sun

Attorney at Jones Day - Irvine, CA

3161 Michelson Dr., Ste. 800

Irvine, CA 92612

John Neil Stuart

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Daniel P Quigley

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

John Gary Kerkorian

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 2300

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2555

Michael Anthony DiGiacomo

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 2300

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2555

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

5 #2

Summons

5 #1

Summons

#5

#4

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union, LLC Only by Guy Kasper. (McBride, Ryan) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Sun, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Stuart, John) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Jennifer Sun on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Discover Financial Services identifying Corporate Parent Discover Bank, Corporate Parent Discover Financial Services for Discover Financial Services. (DiGiacomo, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/29/18. (JAMA) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/29/18. (JAMA) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Douglas L Rayes recused. Case reassigned by random lot to Judge John J Tuchi for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-18-03070-PHX-JJT. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/25/2018. (MMO) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • (#17) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Douglas L. Rayes. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-3070-PHX-DLR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • (#16) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: Defendants time to respond to the complaint is extended by 30 days. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 10/23/18. (EJA) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) *Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings Incorporated, TransUnion and T Rowe Price Group Incorporated as corporate parties by Trans Union LLC. (Stuart, John) *Modified to add corporate parties on 10/24/2018 (EJA). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stuart, John) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint /Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Discover Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiGiacomo, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • (#7) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Discover Financial Services, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SIB). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16017005. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-3070-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (SIB) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Guy Kasper. (McBride, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SIB) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16017005 filed by Guy Kasper. (McBride, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SIB) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Neil Stuart