This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 20:50:42 (UTC).

Karen Clements et al v. Fresenius USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2015 Karen Clements filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Fresenius USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas P. Woodlock. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-12816

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas P. Woodlock

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Karen Clements

Russell Teel

John Guy

Roxi Pritchett

Leatha Robertson

Thomas Chavers

Lisa Bryant

Susan Zenon

Valerie Compton

John Makofske

Donna Farrell

Linda Medina

Joselyn Lampkins

Martha Shaffer

Regina Williams

Gail Donalson

Lashone Brown

Anita Fuller

Danalyn Paciullo

Sadrick Thomas

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baird A Brown

Attorney at Law Offices of Baird Brown

1200, 3055 Wilshire Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Other Attorneys

Carolin Sahimi

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

350 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3442

Juanita R. Brooks

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

12360 El Camino Real, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92130

Maria R. Durant

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

100 High Street, 20Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

David H. Stern

Attorney at Dechert LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2032

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Fresenius Medical Care North America Inc., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#38

(#38) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER SEVERING PLAINTIFFS. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#36

(#36) Assented to MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs in Remaining Multi-Plaintiff Actions by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc..(Durant, Maria) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Maria R. Durant on behalf of FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Fresenius Medical Care North America Inc., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Maria R. Durant on behalf of FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 07/13/2017)

#33

(#33) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 07/13/2017)

31 #2

Exhibit B

31 #1

Exhibit A

31 #7

Main Document

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps. (Stern, David) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

1 #7

Exhibit F to Declaration of David Stern

1 #6

Exhibit E to Declaration of David Stern

1 #5

Exhibit D to Declaration of David Stern

1 #4

Exhibit C to Declaration of David Stern

1 #3

Exhibit B to Declaration of David Stern

1 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration of David Stern

1 #1

Declaration of David Stern in Support of Fresenius Defendants' and Ben Lipp

1 #1

Main Document

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF MDL CASE CLOSED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts. In Re: Fresenius/Granuflo Naturalyte Dialysate Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2428. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Fresenius Medical Care North America Inc., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER SEVERING PLAINTIFFS. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #36 Assented to MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs in Remaining Multi-Plaintiff Actions. (Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Assented to MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs in Remaining Multi-Plaintiff Actions by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc..(Durant, Maria) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Maria R. Durant on behalf of FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Fresenius Medical Care North America Inc., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Maria R. Durant on behalf of FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Docket(#32) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC PROCEDURAL ORDER - In light of the Defendant's Omnibus Motion (ECF#1862) to Dismiss following the failure of the plaintiffs in the 631 cases identified therein to properly comply with Case Management Order No.17 (ECF#1825), the Clerk is directed to enter a Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice on May 3, 2017, in each such case in the absence of further order of this court for good cause shown. (Gioia, AnaMaria) (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Dismiss "Defendant FMCNA's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss" by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gioia, AnaMaria) (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 served on June 2, 2015. (Stern, David) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rn) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (rn) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc, Fresenius Medical Care North America Inc, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps.[FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/29/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT 6](rn) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc, Fresenius Medical Care North America Inc, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales Inc, Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps, Walter L. Weisman. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Linda Medina, Donna Farrell, Jael Clark, Rondall Lanham, Joe Kennedy Jr., Theresa Fos, Celia Banks, Russell Teel, Karen Clements, Alfredo Gallegos, Valerie Compton, Sadrick Thomas, Isela Diaz, Thomas Chavers, Vikki Davis, Lisa Bryant, Theresa Cox, Iris Domino, Gail Donalson, Carmen Corbin, Janice Justice, Cordelia Holmes, Cheryl Donahue, John Makofske, Martha Shaffer, Lews DeLeon, Rudolph Ross, Yvonne Joseph, Anita Fuller, Bea Proctor, Susan Zenon, Regina Williams, John Guy, Thelma Burch, Lashone Brown, Kathy Stewart, Roxi Pritchett, Johnny Colburn, Joselyn Lampkins, Tony Salazar, Jennie Smith, Adon Navarette, Chalmers Ham, Danalyn Paciullo, Eric Lewis, Leatha Robertson, Elva Green.[FILED IN STATE COURT ON 09/23/2014 SUBMITED ATTACHED TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT 2] (rn) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps. (Stern, David) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps. (Stern, David) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps, (Stern, David) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps. (Stern, David) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC557469 Receipt No: 0973-15818188 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Fresenius USA, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Ben Lipps. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Stern in Support of Fresenius Defendants' and Ben Lipps' Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of David Stern, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of David Stern, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of David Stern, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of David Stern, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of David Stern, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of David Stern) (Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Ben Lipps(pty:dft))(Stern, David) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carolin Sahimi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maria R. Durant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David H. Stern

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juanita R. Brooks