This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2020 at 09:22:45 (UTC).

Kaparos v. Wageworks Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 Kaparos filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Wageworks Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan H. Lefkow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-05455

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan H. Lefkow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christine Kaparos

Defendants

Wageworks Inc., doing business as Conexis

The Neiman Marcus Group LLC

Wagework Inc

Wagework Inc doing business as Conexis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Particia N. Jjemba

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, Llc

20 S. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60603

James O. Latturner

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Daniel A. Edelman

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Francis Richard Greene

Attorney at Stern Thomasson LLP

150 Morris Ave, 2Nd Floor

Springfield, NJ 17081-1315

Cathleen M. Combs

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Patricia N. Jjemba

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, Llc

20 S. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Isabella Maria Janusz

Attorney at Edelman Combs Latturner & Goodwin, Llc

20 S. Clark St., Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Elaine Inskeep

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.c.

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 1000

Chicago, IL 60654

Daniel W. Srsic

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

21 East State Street, 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Josephine Tung

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

191 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60606

Gilbert P Brosky

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000, Key Tower

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

 

Court Documents

#55

(#55) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #54 , defendant The Neiman Marcus Group is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own fees and costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#54

(#54) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Janusz, Isabella) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#53

(#53) NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #52 sent to Attorney Josephine Tung returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Josephine Tung a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#52

(#52) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The Court is unavailable on 10/23/2018. The status hearing set for that date is stricken and reset to 10/30/2018 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#51

(#51) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: By request and agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 9/18/2018 is stricken and reset to 10/23/2018 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#50

(#50) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Pursuant to the notice of settlement #49 , the status hearing set for 9/4/2018 is stricken and reset to 9/18/2018 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#49

(#49) SETTLEMENT Agreement Notice of Settlement (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#48

(#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The parties have jointly reported the case has settled. Status hearing set for 8/15/2018 is stricken and reset to 9/4/2018 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#47

(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: At the Court's instance, the status hearing set for 8/7/2018 is stricken and reset to 8/15/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Kaparos by James O. Latturner (Latturner, James) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Kaparos by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Kaparos by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Christine Kaparos; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13410548. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #54 , defendant The Neiman Marcus Group is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own fees and costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Janusz, Isabella) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #52 sent to Attorney Josephine Tung returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Josephine Tung a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The Court is unavailable on 10/23/2018. The status hearing set for that date is stricken and reset to 10/30/2018 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: By request and agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 9/18/2018 is stricken and reset to 10/23/2018 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Pursuant to the notice of settlement #49 , the status hearing set for 9/4/2018 is stricken and reset to 9/18/2018 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) SETTLEMENT Agreement Notice of Settlement (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The parties have jointly reported the case has settled. Status hearing set for 8/15/2018 is stricken and reset to 9/4/2018 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: At the Court's instance, the status hearing set for 8/7/2018 is stricken and reset to 8/15/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow:Status hearing held on 7/24/2018 and continued to 8/7/2018 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Kaparos as to The Neiman Marcus Group LLC on 7/27/2017, answer due 8/17/2017. (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants The Neiman Marcus Group LLC, Wageworks Inc., doing business as Conexis (pg, ) (Entered: 07/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (meg, ) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Kaparos by Particia N. Jjemba (Jjemba, Particia) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Kaparos by Francis Richard Greene (Greene, Francis) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Kaparos by James O. Latturner (Latturner, James) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Kaparos by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Kaparos by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Christine Kaparos; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13410548. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isabella Maria Janusz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Particia N. Jjemba

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel A. Edelman