This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2019 at 07:57:12 (UTC).

KAMMERDIENER v. ARMSTRONG COUNTY et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 KAMMERDIENER filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against ARMSTRONG COUNTY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maureen P. Kelly and Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01484

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONALD E. KAMMERDIENER

Defendants

ERIKA KIRKPATRICK

ARMSTRONG COUNTY

PHILLIP SHAFFER

REGINA HIMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Andrew Salemme

Attorney at The Lindsay Law Firm, P.C.

110 East Diamond Street, Suite 301

Butler, PA 16001

Alexander H. Lindsay, Jr.

Attorney at Lindsay, Jackson & Martin

110 East Diamond Street, Suite 301

Butler, PA 16001

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline Liebenguth

Attorney at Administrative Office of Pennsylvania Courts

Frick Building, 437 Grant Street, Suite 416

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Edmond R. Joyal, Jr.

Attorney at William J. Ferren & Associates

112 Washington Place, Suite 975 Two Chatham Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Elizabeth Farina Collura

Attorney at William J. Ferren & Associates

112 Washington Place, Suite 975 Two Chatham Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Farina Collura terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/07/18. (eca) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#9

RESTRICTED

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ARMSTRONG COUNTY, REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK, PHILLIP SHAFFER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Collura, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Edmond R. Joyal, Jr on behalf of ARMSTRONG COUNTY, REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK, PHILLIP SHAFFER. (Joyal, Edmond) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Liebenguth on behalf of REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK. (Liebenguth, Caroline) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Farina Collura on behalf of ARMSTRONG COUNTY, REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK, PHILLIP SHAFFER. (Collura, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Salemme on behalf of RONALD E. KAMMERDIENER. (Salemme, James) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

1 #5

Summons as to Armstrong County

1 #4

Summons as to Erika Kirkpatrick

1 #3

Summons as to Phillip Shaffer

1 #2

Summons as to Regina Himes

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ARMSTRONG COUNTY, REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK, PHILLIP SHAFFER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4923780), filed by RONALD E. KAMMERDIENER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Regina Himes, #3 Summons as to Phillip Shaffer, #4 Summons as to Erika Kirkpatrick, #5 Summons as to Armstrong County) (jv) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • Judge Cathy Bissoon presiding and Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly referred. (nll) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer presiding in case. (nll) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Farina Collura terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/07/18. (eca) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RONALD E. KAMMERDIENER. (Lindsay, Alexander) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ARMSTRONG COUNTY, REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK, PHILLIP SHAFFER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Collura, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ARMSTRONG COUNTY, REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK, PHILLIP SHAFFER. (Joyal, Edmond) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Edmond R. Joyal, Jr on behalf of ARMSTRONG COUNTY, REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK, PHILLIP SHAFFER. (Joyal, Edmond) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Liebenguth on behalf of REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK. (Liebenguth, Caroline) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • (#4) ORDER OF COURT. Since this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file no later than 12/12/18, a form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a Magistrate Judge, Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/21/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Farina Collura on behalf of ARMSTRONG COUNTY, REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK, PHILLIP SHAFFER. (Collura, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (mao) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer assigned to case. (mao) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan added. (mao) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. (mao) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Salemme on behalf of RONALD E. KAMMERDIENER. (Salemme, James) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Summons Issued as to ARMSTRONG COUNTY, REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK, PHILLIP SHAFFER (jv) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ARMSTRONG COUNTY, REGINA HIMES, ERIKA KIRKPATRICK, PHILLIP SHAFFER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4923780), filed by RONALD E. KAMMERDIENER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Regina Himes, #3 Summons as to Phillip Shaffer, #4 Summons as to Erika Kirkpatrick, #5 Summons as to Armstrong County) (jv) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less