This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2018 at 07:22:37 (UTC).

Emerald Kalama Chemical, LLC v. Arendt

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 Emerald Kalama Chemical, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arendt. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert J. Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-05649

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kalama Emerald Chemical, LLC

Emerald Kalama Chemical, LLC

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee

William D. Arendt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edwin A Harnden

Attorney at BARRAN LIEBMAN LLP

601 Sw Second Ave, Ste 2300

Portland, OR 97204-3159

Richard C Hunt

Attorney at BARRAN LIEBMAN LLP

601 Sw Second Ave, Ste 2300

Portland, OR 97204-3159

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel K. Reising

Attorney at FUCILE & REISING

800 Nw Sixth Avenue, Suite 211

Portland, OR 97209-3783

Irving M Geslewitz

Attorney at MUCH SHELIST P.C.

191 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

30 #1

Proposed Order

#30

(#30) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant William D. Arendt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/26/2018, (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#29

(#29) ORDER ON PLAINTIFF EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL, LLC'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, denying #9 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#28

(#28) ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR DEFEND, granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant may file an Answer or Rule 12(b) motion by September 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(JL) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#27

(#27) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Emerald Kalama Chemical, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Hunt, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#24

(#24) DECLARATION of Richard William D. Arendt filed by Defendant William D. Arendt re #9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Reising, Daniel) Modified on 9/18/2018 (PS). (Entered: 09/16/2018)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#22) Supplemental DECLARATION of Daniel K. Reising filed by Defendant William D. Arendt re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#23) RESPONSE, by Defendant William D. Arendt, to #9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2018)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Emerald Performance Materials, LLC, Corporate Parent EPM Kalama Chemical Holding Corp., Corporate Parent EPM Polymer Additives Holding Corp., Corporate Parent EPM Specialty Polymers Holding Corp., Corporate Parent ASP Emerald Acquisition Holdings One LLC, Corporate Parent ASP Emerald Acquisition Holdings Three LLC, Corporate Parent American Securities Partners for Emerald Kalama Chemical, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Emerald Kalama Chemical, LLC (Hunt, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/29/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/5/2018, Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2018. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant William D. Arendt. (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency: Civil Cover Sheet** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (CMG) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#2

(#2) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Cowlitz County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CMG) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cowlitz County Superior Court, case number 18-2-00815-8; (Receipt # 0981-5431079), filed by William D. Arendt. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant William D. Arendt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/26/2018, (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER ON PLAINTIFF EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL, LLC'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, denying #9 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR DEFEND, granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant may file an Answer or Rule 12(b) motion by September 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(JL) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Emerald Kalama Chemical, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Hunt, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #24 Declaration : Amended docket text to correctly identify defendant William D. Arendt, per counsel request. (PS) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) DECLARATION of Irving M. Geslewitz filed by Defendant William D. Arendt re #9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) DECLARATION of Tim Horn filed by Defendant William D. Arendt re #9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) DECLARATION of Richard William D. Arendt filed by Defendant William D. Arendt re #9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Reising, Daniel) Modified on 9/18/2018 (PS). (Entered: 09/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE, by Defendant William D. Arendt, to #9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Supplemental DECLARATION of Daniel K. Reising filed by Defendant William D. Arendt re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Emerald Performance Materials, LLC, Corporate Parent EPM Kalama Chemical Holding Corp., Corporate Parent EPM Polymer Additives Holding Corp., Corporate Parent EPM Specialty Polymers Holding Corp., Corporate Parent ASP Emerald Acquisition Holdings One LLC, Corporate Parent ASP Emerald Acquisition Holdings Three LLC, Corporate Parent American Securities Partners for Emerald Kalama Chemical, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Emerald Kalama Chemical, LLC (Hunt, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • JSR due 11/13/2018. (JL) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/29/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/5/2018, Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2018. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant William D. Arendt. (Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/21/2018. (CMG) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency: Civil Cover Sheet** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (CMG) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Cowlitz County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CMG) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (CMG) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cowlitz County Superior Court, case number 18-2-00815-8; (Receipt # 0981-5431079), filed by William D. Arendt. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Reising, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.