This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2018 at 07:47:56 (UTC).

Julian v. Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2018 Julian filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H L Perez-Montes and Dee D Drell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01108

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

Presiding Judge

Dee D Drell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edgar Tibakweitira Julian

Jena, LA 71342

Defendants

Bureau of Immigration & Customs Enforcement

U S Dept of Homeland Security

 

Court Documents

3 #2

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/29/2018. (crt,HaikSld, K) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #1

*Restricted*

3 #3

*Restricted*

#8

RESTRICTED

3 #4

Letter

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2018: #4 Letter) (Devillier, W). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/29/2018. (crt,HaikSld, K) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/2/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IT IS RECOMMENDED that re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian be DISMISSED without prejudice as premature. Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/24/2018. (crt,Roaix, G) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/29/2018. (crt,HaikSld, K) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/29/2018. (crt,HaikSld, K) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/29/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2018: #4 Letter) (Devillier, W). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 64635007298, filing fee $5) filed by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibits, #4 Letter, #5 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.