This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:56:50 (UTC).

Judy v. Covenant Transport, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Judy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Covenant Transport, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00199

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Judy

Defendant

Covenant Transport, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell L Leonard

Attorney at Law Office of Russell L. Leonard

315 North High Street

Winchester, TN 37398

Defendant Attorney

John R Bode

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC (Chattanooga)

832 Georgia Avenue, 1200 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Other notice of consent/non-consent

#10

(#10) Alias Summons Issued as to Covenant Transport, Inc. (KFB, ) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#6

(#6) Alias Summons Issued as to Covenant Transport, Inc.. (DJH, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Covenant Transport, Inc.., filed by Kevin Judy.(Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#12

(#12) STIPULATION re #7 Amended Complaint Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond by Covenant Transport, Inc.. (Bode, John). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#5

(#5) SUPPLEMENT Alias Summons by Kevin Judy. (Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other notice of consent/non-consent) (DJH, ) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Judy. Covenant Transport, Inc. served on 9/19/2018. (Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED for 11/26/2018, at 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/17/2018. (CEA) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/11/2018. (CEA) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Covenant Transport, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3753212.), filed by Kevin Judy. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#9

(#9) SUPPLEMENT Alias Summons for Covenant Transport by Kevin Judy. (Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#2

(#2) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED for 11/26/2018, at 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/17/2018. (CEA) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/11/2018. (CEA) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION re #7 Amended Complaint Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond by Covenant Transport, Inc.. (Bode, John). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Judy. Covenant Transport, Inc. served on 9/19/2018. (Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Alias Summons Issued as to Covenant Transport, Inc. (KFB, ) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENT Alias Summons for Covenant Transport by Kevin Judy. (Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other notice of consent/non-consent) (DJH, ) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Covenant Transport, Inc.., filed by Kevin Judy.(Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Alias Summons Issued as to Covenant Transport, Inc.. (DJH, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUPPLEMENT Alias Summons by Kevin Judy. (Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Covenant Transport, Inc. (JCK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Covenant Transport, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3753212.), filed by Kevin Judy. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Leonard, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.