This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:14:52 (UTC).

Juarez v. HRB Resources, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Juarez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against HRB Resources, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Phil Gilbert and Reona J. Daly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01537

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

Referral Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Juarez

Defendant

HRB Resources, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Brunton

Attorney at Brunton Law Offices, P.C.

819 Vandalia (Highway 159)

Collinsville, IL 62234

Defendant Attorney

Adama K. Wiltshire

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC-St. Louis

600 Washington Ave., Suite 900

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/7/2018. (jdh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 18L191 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3654068), filed by HRB Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#14

(#14) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by HRB Resources, LLC. . (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit Exb. A First Amended Complaint

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Adama K. Wiltshire on behalf of HRB Resources, LLC (Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by HRB Resources, LLC. (Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION For Stay Pending Arbitration by HRB Resources, LLC. (Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by HRB Resources, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff (Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

14 #1

State Court Complaint Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Co

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 2:15 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call.(jlm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#8

(#8) CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/25/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Bench Trial is set for 10/7/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HRB Resources, LLC. (Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#7

(#7) Emergency MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint to Add IHRA Counts by Maria Juarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exb. A First Amended Complaint)(Brunton, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-cv-1537-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (cds) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • (#17) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing: The Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 9/27/2018 is CANCELED. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/7/2018. (jdh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION For Stay Pending Arbitration by HRB Resources, LLC. (Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by HRB Resources, LLC. . (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#13) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 2:15 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call.(jlm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by HRB Resources, LLC. Defendant is GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 9/10/2018, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 9/4/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by HRB Resources, LLC. (Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER FINDING AS MOOT #7 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint to Add IHRA Counts filed by Maria Juarez. Pursuant to Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a party may amend its pleading once as a matter of course, and without leave of court, within 21 days after service of a responsive pleading. Defendants has not yet filed a responsive pleading. Accordingly, leave of court to file an amended complaint is not required and Plaintiff's motion is moot. Plaintiff is directed to electronically file her First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/30/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/25/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Bench Trial is set for 10/7/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Emergency MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint to Add IHRA Counts by Maria Juarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exb. A First Amended Complaint)(Brunton, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • (#6) ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Courts civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 9/10/2018(cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-cv-1537-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (cds) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HRB Resources, LLC. (Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by HRB Resources, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff (Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Adama K. Wiltshire on behalf of HRB Resources, LLC (Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 18L191 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3654068), filed by HRB Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wiltshire, Adama) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.