This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:05 (UTC).

JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association v. Rabadan et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association filed an Other lawsuit against Rabadan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05852

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association

JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC

Defendant

Bertha Rabadan

Intervenor

Cortes Hubel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph M Herbas

Attorney at Shapiro Kreisman & Associates, LLC

2121 Waukegan Road, #301

Bannockburn, IL 60015

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Motion by Joseph M Herbas for presentment of motion to remand #5 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/3/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Herbas, Joseph) (Entered: 09/15/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Received for docket 8/27/2018) (ek, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 10/3/2018. Plaintiff JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC's motion #5 to dismiss is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants' motion #3 for right to access to the court without filing fees is denied. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (09ch23979) filed by Cortes Hubel. (Exhibits) (Received for Docket 8/27/2018) (ek, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#9

(#9) ENTERED JUDGMENT on 10/3/2018. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

#5

(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judgment of Foreclosure, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Approving Sale)(Herbas, Joseph) (Entered: 09/15/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF by Defendant Cortes Hubel right to court access without filing fees. (Received for docket 8/27/2018) (ek, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Notice of Appearance and Motion to Dismiss by Cortes Hubel. (gcy, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

5 #2

Exhibit 2 - Judgment of Foreclosure

5 #3

Exhibit 3 - Order Approving Sale

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENTERED JUDGMENT on 10/3/2018. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 10/3/2018. Plaintiff JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC's motion #5 to dismiss is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants' motion #3 for right to access to the court without filing fees is denied. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Notice of Appearance and Motion to Dismiss by Cortes Hubel. (gcy, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Motion by Joseph M Herbas for presentment of motion to remand #5 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/3/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Herbas, Joseph) (Entered: 09/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION by Plaintiff JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judgment of Foreclosure, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Approving Sale)(Herbas, Joseph) (Entered: 09/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF by Defendant Cortes Hubel right to court access without filing fees. (Received for docket 8/27/2018) (ek, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Received for docket 8/27/2018) (ek, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (09ch23979) filed by Cortes Hubel. (Exhibits) (Received for Docket 8/27/2018) (ek, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less